EP3951774 - VOICE-BASED WAKEUP METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Shuwei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Xiang Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/24] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
LI, Shuwei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
CHEN, Xiang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20806446.9 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020CN90489 | Priority number, date | CN201910407712 | 16.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910407712 | [2022/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020228815 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951774 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3951774 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/16, G10L15/22, G10L21/034 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
G10L21/034 (EP,CN);
G10L15/22 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/167 (EP);
G10L15/08 (US);
G10L25/21 (EP);
G10L25/51 (EP);
G10L2015/088 (EP,US);
G10L2015/223 (EP,CN,US);
G10L21/0216 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/06] | G10L15/22, G10L21/034 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFWECKVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG AUF SPRACHBASIS | [2022/06] | English: | VOICE-BASED WAKEUP METHOD AND DEVICE | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉVEIL VOCAL | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2021 | Translation filed | 26.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 24.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005071160 (HUANG TAI-HUEI [TW]); | [A]CN107919119 (BAIDU ONLINE NETWORK TECHNOLOGY BEIJING CO LTD); | [A]CN109391528 (BAIDU ONLINE NETWORK TECHNOLOGY BEIJING CO LTD); | US2019147904 [ ] (TAO SHA [CN], et al); | US2019341049 [ ] (CHENG GAOFEI [CN], et al) | International search | [A]CN106161755 (YUTAIXIN MICROELECTRONIC TECH (SHANGHAI) CO LTD, et al); | [A]US2017162205 (MELVIN MARK [CA], et al); | [A]CN107919119 (BAIDU ONLINE NETWORK TECHNOLOGY BEIJING CO LTD); | [A]US2018254041 (HARPER JAMES D [US]); | [A]CN108712566 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN109036412 (SUZHOU QIMENGZHE NETWORL TECH CO LTD); | [PX]CN110223684 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |