EP4078638 - EMERGENCY-STOP SWITCH AND MACHINE WITH AN EMERGENCY-STOP SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becker Mining Systems AG Landwehrplatz 6-7 66111 Saarbrücken / DE | [2023/46] |
Former [2022/43] | For all designated states Becker Mining Systems AG Walter-Becker-Straße 1 66299 Friedrichsthal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOBBE, Thomas Auf der Brey 66 46286 Dorsten / DE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20806954.2 | 11.11.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP81685 | Priority number, date | DE201910135227 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019135227 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021121785 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4078638 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/02 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
H01H3/0226 (EP,US);
H01H15/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | NOT-HALT-SCHALTER UND MASCHINE MIT NOT-HALT-SCHALTER | [2022/43] | English: | EMERGENCY-STOP SWITCH AND MACHINE WITH AN EMERGENCY-STOP SWITCH | [2022/43] | French: | INTERRUPTEUR D'ARRÊT D'URGENCE ET MACHINE ÉQUIPÉE D'UN INTERRUPTEUR D'ARRÊT D'URGENCE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 30.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2216723 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]); | [Y]WO2008047102 (IDEM SAFETY SWITCHES LTD [GB], et al); | [A]DE102010060506 (DEMAG CRANES & COMPONENTS GMBH [DE]) |