EP4065864 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ASCERTAINING AN ACTUATION FORCE OF AN ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2024/01] |
Former [2022/40] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEIS-ESSER, Daniel Sonnenblumenstr. 15 81377 München / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20806959.1 | 11.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020EP81693 | Priority number, date | DE201910131945 | 26.11.2019 Original published format: DE102019131945 | [2022/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021104862 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4065864 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/28, F16H61/32, F16H63/30 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
F16H61/28 (EP);
F16H61/32 (EP);
F16H63/304 (EP);
F16H2061/2823 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMITTLUNG EINER BETÄTIGUNGSKRAFT EINES STELLAKTUATORS | [2022/40] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ASCERTAINING AN ACTUATION FORCE OF AN ACTUATOR | [2022/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR DÉTERMINER UNE FORCE D'ACTIONNEMENT D'UN ACTIONNEUR | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 27.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE19723393 (LUK GETRIEBE SYSTEME GMBH [DE]); | [XI]DE10065387 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]); | [XI]DE10136731 (ZF SACHS AG [DE]); | [X]DE19758518 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) |