EP4065785 - SINK WITH BASIN AND SEPARATE MOVABLE INSERT PLATE WHICH SEALS A DRAIN IN THE BASIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÖLFLER, Andreas Bachwinkl 136/2 5760 Saalfelden / AT | 02 /
REU, Benjamin Erlenweg 13a 83209 Prien am Chiemsee / DE | 03 /
SUKALE, Jörg Flurstr. 15 83342 Tacherting / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20806981.5 | 11.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020EP81742 | Priority number, date | DE201910218649 | 29.11.2019 Original published format: DE102019218649 | [2022/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021104875 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4065785 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/186 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
E03C1/186 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | SPÜLBECKEN MIT WANNE UND SEPARATER UND VERFAHRBARER EINSATZPLATTE, DIE EINEN ABLAUF IN DER WANNE ABDICHTET | [2022/40] | English: | SINK WITH BASIN AND SEPARATE MOVABLE INSERT PLATE WHICH SEALS A DRAIN IN THE BASIN | [2022/40] | French: | ÉVIER AVEC BASSIN ET PLAQUE D'INSERT MOBILE SÉPARÉE QUI SCELLE UN DRAIN DANS LE BASSIN | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 29.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN106579805 (TAIZHOU HEYUN MACHINERY CO LTD) [A] 7* figure 5 *; | [XI]CN108316413 (NINGBO MENSARJOR KITCHEN WARES CO LTD) [X] 1-3,8,9 * figures 1-3,5,7 * [I] 7 | by applicant | DE3621151 | US2005067747 |