EP4028704 - SUPERCRITICAL DRYING OF CHROMATOGRAPHIC MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Millipore Ltd. Tullagreen County Cork Carrigtwohill / IE | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYLE, John c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 400 Summit Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | 02 /
SKARJA, Gary c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 400 Summit Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | 03 /
RAGHEB, Amro c/o EMD Millipore Corporation 400 Summit Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20807103.5 | 14.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020IB00832 | Priority number, date | US201962900155P | 13.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962900155 P | US201962900798P | 16.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962900798 P | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021048633 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4028704 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4028704 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F26B3/00, B01J20/26, B01J20/28, B01J20/291, C07K1/16, F26B21/14 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
F26B21/14 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/267 (EP,KR,US);
B01D15/08 (KR);
B01J20/28033 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/28057 (EP,KR);
B01J20/28078 (EP,KR);
B01J20/2808 (US);
B01J20/28083 (US);
B01J20/291 (EP,KR);
B01J20/305 (US);
C07K1/16 (EP);
C07K1/22 (EP,KR);
F26B21/10 (US);
F26B3/00 (EP,KR);
F26B3/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERKRITISCHE TROCKNUNG VON CHROMATOGRAPHISCHEN MEDIEN | [2024/02] | English: | SUPERCRITICAL DRYING OF CHROMATOGRAPHIC MEDIA | [2022/29] | French: | SÉCHAGE SUPERCRITIQUE DES MILIEUX CHROMATOGRAPHIQUES | [2024/02] |
Former [2022/29] | SUPERKRITISCHES TROCKNEN VON CHROMATOGRAFISCHEN MEDIEN | ||
Former [2022/29] | SÉCHAGE SUPERCRITIQUE DE MILIEUX CHROMATOGRAPHIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 31.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24165078.7 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002187302 (KOSLOW EVAN [US]); | [A]US6638885 (MCGRATH KATHRYN M [US], et al); | [A]US2005079337 (HASHIDA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]CN101851398 (BEIJING INST TECHNOLOGY); | [A]US2011253616 (CHILDS RONALD F [CA], et al); | [A]US2012231251 (KIM KWANG HEE [KR], et al); | [A]WO2014140860 (NATRIX SEPARATIONS INC [CA]); | [Y]US2016243538 (RAGHEB AMRO [CA], et al); | [XYI]US2019100630 (IWANAGA KOUTA [JP], et al); | [A]GB2571292 (GRAPHENE COMPOSITES LTD [GB]) | by applicant | US7316919 | US8133840 | US8187880 | US8192971 | US8206958 | US8206982 | US8211682 | US8367809 | US8383782 | US8652849 | US9962691 | US10357766 |