EP4040945 - LOG GRAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zaglacher, Andreas Sonnenweg 15 6342 Niederndorf / AT | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20807256.1 | 07.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020EP77986 | Priority number, date | AT20190000115U | 07.10.2019 Original published format: AT 11519 U | [2022/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069435 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4040945 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01G23/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A01G23/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | HOLZGREIFER | [2022/33] | English: | LOG GRAB | [2022/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉHENSION DE BOIS | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 27.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2639937 (BILLINGS ROY O); | [XY]US2916322 (WIRKKALA ALBERT R); | [X]WO03008716 (ROTOBEC INC [CA], et al); | [XY]US2008196790 (FARGEOT RAYMOND [CA]) |