EP4048583 - GENERATION OF ELECTRICAL POWER OFFSHORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Subsea 7 Norway AS Kanalsletta 9 4033 Stavanger / NO | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Paul Douglas Øvre Stokka Vei 38 4023 Stavanger / NO | 02 /
KLOSTER, Ernst Kristen Helgøy Duesvei 22 4023 Stavanger / NO | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Keltie LLP No. 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20807292.6 | 22.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020EP79820 | Priority number, date | GB20190015503 | 25.10.2019 Original published format: GB 201915503 | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021078899 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4048583 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/50, F03D9/25, F03D13/25, F03B13/06, F16L1/19, H02G9/12, B63B35/44 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
B63B21/50 (EP,GB,US);
B63B35/44 (GB,US);
B63B21/20 (US);
B63B21/26 (US);
B63B27/29 (US);
F03B13/06 (EP);
F03D13/25 (EP,GB);
F03D9/257 (EP);
F16L1/19 (EP);
B63B2021/505 (GB);
B63B2035/4433 (GB);
B63B2035/4453 (US);
B63B2035/446 (EP,GB,US);
B63B2035/4466 (US);
B63B21/502 (EP);
F03D9/14 (EP);
F05B2240/93 (EP);
F05B2240/97 (EP);
H02G9/12 (EP);
Y02E10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/727 (EP);
Y02E60/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | OFFSHORE-STROMERZEUGUNG | [2022/35] | English: | GENERATION OF ELECTRICAL POWER OFFSHORE | [2022/35] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE EN MER | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 17.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE102012100981 (SCHRAMM RAINER [DE]); | [IAY]US2014044541 (DUPIN DE LA GUERIVIERE PAUL [FR]); | [A]WO2014055027 (HEXICON AB [SE]); | [XA]EP2789849 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) | by applicant | WO9729943 | WO9745318 | WO9748596 | WO0210589 | US6408781 | WO2006042178 | JP3944445B | WO2008152505 | WO2019043105 | GB2578473 |