EP4048199 - MECHANICALLY ANISOTROPIC 3D PRINTED FLEXIBLE POLYMERIC SHEATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carbon, Inc. 1089 Mills Way Redwood City, California 94063 / US | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KABARIA, Hardik 28 Alameda De Las Pulgas Redwood City, California 94062 / US | 02 /
MEYER, Eleanor R. 25 Saddleback Dr Portola Valley, California 94028 / US | 03 /
POLLACK, Steven Kenneth 705 Hudson St. Redwood City, California 94061 / US | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20807937.6 | 20.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020US56468 | Priority number, date | US201962925838P | 25.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962925838 P | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021080974 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4048199 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/07, A61B17/11, A61L27/40, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
A61B17/1128 (EP);
C08G63/08 (US);
A61L31/06 (EP);
A61L31/146 (EP);
A61L31/148 (EP);
B29C64/124 (EP);
B29C64/129 (US);
B29C64/30 (EP);
B29C64/35 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP);
B33Y40/20 (EP);
B33Y70/00 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP);
A61B2017/00004 (EP);
A61B2017/00526 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L31/06, C08L67/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | MECHANISCH ANISOTROPE 3D-GEDRUCKTE FLEXIBLE POLYMERHÜLLE | [2022/35] | English: | MECHANICALLY ANISOTROPIC 3D PRINTED FLEXIBLE POLYMERIC SHEATH | [2022/35] | French: | GAINE POLYMÈRE FLEXIBLE IMPRIMÉE 3D MÉCANIQUEMENT ANISOTROPE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 16.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008300691 (ROMERO-ORTEGA MARIO I [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,11,23 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0041] * [I] 6; | [XI]US2013158651 (HOLLISTER SCOTT J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9,11,23,28 * figures 1A,1B,4,7A,7B,10C,14A * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0083] *[I] 8,10; | [XAI]US2018117219 (YANG JIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9-11,20,23,24,26,28-32 * figures 3a-3c,5d,7,11; claims 9,10,11 * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0119] * [A] 3,15,17-19,25 [I] 12-14,16,20-22,27,33 | by applicant | US3213058 | US5236637 | US5391072 | US5529473 | US6916867 | US7157586 | US7438846 | US7695643 | US7892474 | US8110135 | US8209899 | US2013292862 | US2013295212 | WO2015164234 | US2015331402 | US9205601 | US9211678 | US2015360419 | US9216546 | US9453142 | US2016288376 | US9598606 | US2017129169 | US2017129167 | US9676963 | WO2017210298 | US2018126630 | US2018243976 | US2018290374 | US10259171 | US2019160733 | US10434706 | - J. TUMBLESTOND. SHIRVANYANTSN. ERMOSHKIN et al., "Continuous liquid interface production of 3D Objects", Science, (20150000), vol. 347, pages 1349 - 1352 | - R. JANUSZIEWCZ et al., "Layerless fabrication with continuous liquid interface production", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20160000), vol. 113, doi:10.1073/pnas.1605271113, pages 11703 - 11708, XP055542052 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1605271113 |