EP4046329 - PROVABLY FAIR GAMES USING A BLOCKCHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states nChain Licensing AG Grafenauweg 6 6300 Zug / CH | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIES, Jack Owen c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | 02 /
TARTAN, Chloe c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | 03 /
WRIGHT, Craig Steven c/o nChain Holdings Limited 30 Market Place London W1W 8AP / GB | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [2023/35] |
Former [2022/34] | Mahon, Thomas James, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 20808191.9 | 03.11.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020IB60295 | Priority number, date | GB20190017284 | 27.11.2019 Original published format: GB 201917284 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021105795 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4046329 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4046329 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, H04L9/32 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H04L9/3239 (EP,KR);
H04L9/0869 (KR);
G07F17/3241 (GB,KR,US);
G07F17/3225 (GB,KR,US);
G07F17/3276 (GB,US);
G07F17/3288 (KR);
G07F17/3293 (GB,KR,US);
H04L9/14 (US);
H04L9/30 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHWEISBAR FAIRE SPIELE MIT EINER BLOCKCHAIN | [2022/34] | English: | PROVABLY FAIR GAMES USING A BLOCKCHAIN | [2022/34] | French: | JEUX DONT L'ÉQUITÉ PEUT ÊTRE ATTESTÉE À L'AIDE D'UNE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 20.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23183830.1 / EP4231585 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | LU | 03.11.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
LU | 03.11.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2019130698 (SIMONS JORDAN [US]) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0079] *; | [A] - ZHIFENG JIA ET AL, "DeLottery: A Novel Decentralized Lottery System Based on Blockchain Technology", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20191106), XP081526212 [A] 1-28 * abstract * * Chapter 1: "Introduction" * * Chapter 3: "Security Concerns and RANDAO" * * Chapter 4: "Lottery System Design" * | [A] - ALISA CHERNYAEVA ET AL, "Game Channels: State Channels for the Gambling Industry with Built-In PRNG", vol. 20190410:002020, (20190404), pages 1 - 27, IACR, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR CRYPTOLOGIC RESEARCH, URL: http://eprint.iacr.org/2019/362.pdf, (20190404), XP061032042 [A] 1-28 * abstract * * Chapter 1: "Introduction" * * Chapter 3: "Game Channels" * | [A] - LIAO DA-YIN ET AL, "Design of a Blockchain-Based Lottery System for Smart Cities Applications", 2017 IEEE 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COLLABORATION AND INTERNET COMPUTING (CIC), IEEE, (20171015), doi:10.1109/CIC.2017.00044, pages 275 - 282, XP033269768 [A] 1-28 * abstract * * Chapter I: "Introduction" * * Chapter IV: "Lottery Operations Basics" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIC.2017.00044 |