EP4061686 - TRANSFER EQUIPMENT FOR SELF-PROPELLED CARRIAGES ON A NETWORK SIMILAR TO AN ELEVATED RAILWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ottobahn GmbH Seitnerstraße 47 c 82049 Pullach im Isartal / DE | [2024/28] |
Former [2022/39] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHLHAFER, Olaf Lemberger Str. 8 74391 Erligheim / DE | 02 /
STUKE, Bernd Lamternstr. 2 71229 Leonberg / DE | 03 /
JAEGLE, Felix Im Sonnigen Winkel 5 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20808385.7 | 18.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020EP82496 | Priority number, date | DE201910217954 | 21.11.2019 Original published format: DE102019217954 | [2022/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021099364 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4061686 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B61B7/00 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
B61B7/00 (EP,KR);
B61B3/02 (US);
B61B12/02 (KR);
B61B7/06 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | ÜBERFÜHREINRICHTUNG FÜR SELBSTFAHRENDE WAGEN AN EINEM HOCHBAHNÄHNLICHEN STRECKENNETZ | [2022/39] | English: | TRANSFER EQUIPMENT FOR SELF-PROPELLED CARRIAGES ON A NETWORK SIMILAR TO AN ELEVATED RAILWAY | [2022/39] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT DE TRANSFERT POUR CHARIOTS AUTOMOTEURS SUR UN RÉSEAU SIMILAIRE À UN CHEMIN DE FER SURÉLEVÉ | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 21.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2096671 (BERTIN & CIE); | [XA]DE202005009874U (INNOVA PATENT GMBH WOLFURT [AT]); | [A]FR2964930 (DENIS CREISSELS CONSULTANT [FR]); | [I]WO2016088147 (INNTECH S R L LAB [IT]); | [XA]CN106428031 (LI ZHONGDONG); | [A]DE102017219226 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]EP3552916 (LEITNER SPA [IT]) | by applicant | US2017313328 |