EP3969457 - METHODS OF PREPARING MACROCYCLIC INDOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Broad Institute Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THEDE, Kai 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
WITTROCK, Sven 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
MCKINNEY, David C/o The Broad Institute, Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 04 /
LEMKE, Christopher C/o The Broad Institute, Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 05 /
FERRARA, Steven, James C/o The Broad Institute, Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 06 /
FURST, Laura C/o The Broad Institute, Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 07 /
WEI, Guo C/o The Broad Institute, Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 08 /
MCCARREN, Patrick, Ryan C/o The Broad Institute, Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 09 /
MENGEL, Anne 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20808660.3 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020US33067 | Priority number, date | US201962849515P | 17.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962849515 P | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020236556 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3969457 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/14, C07D413/00, C07D413/14 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D498/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG MAKROCYCLISCHER INDOLE | [2022/12] | English: | METHODS OF PREPARING MACROCYCLIC INDOLES | [2022/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION D'INDOLES MACROCYCLIQUES | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 09.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2016106731 (LEE TAEKYU [US], et al); | [Y]WO2017198341 (BAYER AG [DE], et al); | [PY]WO2019096905 (BAYER AG [DE], et al); | [PY]WO2019096907 (BAYER AG [DE], et al); | [PY]WO2019096909 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al); | [PY]WO2019096914 (BAYER AG [DE], et al); | [PY]WO2019096922 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO2012112363 |