EP3973139 - AUTOMATED SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING OILFIELD INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Geoquest Systems B.V. Gevers Deynootweg 61 2586 BJ The Hague / NL | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORRINGTON, Tracy WesternGeco 10001 Richmond Avenue Houston, Texas 77042 / US | 02 /
HSU, Chiao-Fang 3750 Briarpark Dr Houston, Texas 77042-4205 / US | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20808795.7 | 19.05.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020US33568 | Priority number, date | US201962850017P | 20.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962850017 P | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020236799 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3973139 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/28, G06F16/34, G06F16/901, G06N5/022, G06N20/00, E21B43/00, E21B41/00, E21B7/00 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
E21B43/00 (EP);
G06F16/2228 (US);
E21B41/00 (EP);
E21B7/00 (EP);
G06F16/24578 (US);
G06F16/288 (US);
G06F16/3334 (EP);
G06F16/9024 (EP);
G06N5/022 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | E21B41/00, E21B47/12, E21B47/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON ÖLFELDINFORMATION | [2022/13] | English: | AUTOMATED SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING OILFIELD INFORMATION | [2022/13] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ AUTOMATISÉS DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS DE CHAMP PÉTROLIFÈRE | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 30.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2019023982 (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SOLUTIONS LTD [IE], et al); | [IA]US2019102430 (WANG ZHIJIE [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2008228830 (HAWTIN STEVE [GB]); | [A]US2009194274 (DEL CASTILLO YANIL [US], et al); | [Y]US2011289074 (LEBAN ROY [US]); | [A]US2012046978 (CARTWRIGHT KATHRYN [US]); | [YX]US2014019404 (CHO RAYMOND J [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2019023982 | US2019102430 |