EP3974466 - PREPREG, LAMINATE, AND MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISUMI, Jun c/o Ehime Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1515, Oaza-tsutsui, Masaki-cho Iyo-gun, Ehime 791-3193 / JP | 02 /
HONMA, Masato c/o Ehime Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1515, Oaza-tsutsui, Masaki-cho Iyo-gun, Ehime 791-3193 / JP | 03 /
SHINOHARA, Kyoko c/o Ehime Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1515, Oaza-tsutsui, Masaki-cho Iyo-gun, Ehime 791-3193 / JP | 04 /
HIRANO, Noriyuki c/o Ehime Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1515, Oaza-tsutsui, Masaki-cho Iyo-gun, Ehime 791-3193 / JP | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20808920.1 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020JP19467 | Priority number, date | JP20190097031 | 23.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019097031 | JP20190097033 | 23.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019097033 | [2022/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020235485 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974466 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/24, B32B5/28, B32B27/38, B32B3/08, B32B5/02, B32B5/12, B32B5/26 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
C08J5/243 (EP,US);
B32B3/08 (EP);
B32B5/02 (EP);
B32B5/12 (EP);
B32B5/26 (EP);
B32B2250/00 (EP);
B32B2250/20 (EP);
B32B2260/023 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (EP);
B32B2307/538 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/542 (EP);
B32B2307/558 (EP);
B32B2307/748 (EP);
B32B2457/00 (EP);
B32B2603/00 (EP);
B32B2605/08 (EP);
B32B2605/18 (EP);
C08J2323/12 (EP,US);
C08J2363/00 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
C08J2371/00 (EP);
C08J2371/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | C08J5/24, B32B5/28, B32B27/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | PREPREG, LAMINAT UND FORMKÖRPER | [2022/13] | English: | PREPREG, LAMINATE, AND MOLDED ARTICLE | [2022/13] | French: | PRÉ-IMPRÉGNÉ, STRATIFIÉ, ET ARTICLE MOULÉ | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2021 | Translation filed | 05.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 29.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1593491 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 2,9,11,16 * paragraph [0187] - paragraph [0221]; examples 1-1 to 1-8 * * claims 1-38 * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP2623533 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 6,15 * abstract ** paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0152]; examples 1-26; tables 2-4 *; | [XY]WO2018066600 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,10,12-14,17-19 * WPI abstract * [Y] 2,6,9,11,15,16; | [XP]US2019225764 (HARADA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) [XP] 1,3-5,7,8,10,12-14,17-19 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0156] * * paragraph [0219] - paragraph [0273]; examples 1-4 * * figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]JPH01104625 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-19 * entire text *; | [A]JPH08337707 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-19* entire text *; | [A]JP2003201388 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-19 * entire text *; | [A]WO2004060658 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * entire text *; | [A]JP2012051989 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) [A] 1-19 * entire text *; | [XA]WO2018066600 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [X] 1, 3-5, 7, 8, 10-14, 16-19 * claims, paragraphs [0014], [0024]-[0026], [0032], [0033], [0038]-[0046], [0062], [0076], [0093], examples, table 1, fig. 1, 3 * [A] 2, 6, 9, 15; | [A]WO2018117214 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * examples *; | [A]JP2019038939 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-19 * entire text * | by applicant | JPH08259713 | JPH10138354 | JP3906319B | JP2018161801 |