EP3972936 - PROCESS FOR PURIFYING A SODIUM SULFATE RESIDUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY SA Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOOD, Michael 19 Kaibin Road, Building 6, Unit 2203, Xuhui District Shanghai 200032 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Yan Room 103, Block 3, 269 Fenglin Road, Xuhui District Shanghai 200032 / CN | 03 /
BEDEL, Sabrina 12 Rue Guillaume Apollinaire 54110 Dombasle Sur Meurthe / FR | 04 /
CRIADO, Claude 9 Rue Du Pr. Albert Fruhinsholz 54000 Nancy / FR | 05 /
WANG, Aiping Room 501, No. 2, Lane 3151 Yindu Road Minhang District Shanghai 201109 / CN | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | Vande Gucht, Anne Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 20809363.3 | 19.05.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020CN90982 | Priority number, date | CN201920741030U | 22.05.2019 Original published format: CN 201920741030 U | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020233558 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3972936 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C01D5/16 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
C01D5/16 (EP,CN,KR);
C01P2006/80 (EP,CN,KR);
C01P2006/82 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON NATRIUMSULFATRÜCKSTÄNDEN | [2022/13] | English: | PROCESS FOR PURIFYING A SODIUM SULFATE RESIDUE | [2022/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION D'UN RÉSIDU DE SULFATE DE SODIUM | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 14.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1397497 (JAMES ANDERSON ROBERT) [X] 15 * page 3 - page 4 *; | [X]WO0162886 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 15 * example - *; | [A]KR100582801B (KOREA INST CERAMIC ENG & TECH [KR]) [A] 1-15 * page 3 - page 4 *; | [X]US2013072371 (JANSEN LAWRENCE E [US], et al) [X] 15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] *; | [A]US8658122 (MARTINEZ MARTINEZ JESUS MANUEL [MX], et al) [A] 1-15* example -; claim - *; | [X] - MOULAY S ET AL, "ALGERIAN MONTMORILLONITE AS A BUILDER IN A DETERGENT POWDER", JOURNAL SURFACTDETERG,, (20030401), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S11743-003-0253-6, ISSN 1097-3958, pages 113 - 118, XP001164060 [X] 15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11743-003-0253-6 | International search | [Y]US6180074 (FOURCOT FABRICE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-20 * claims 1, 11 and 13 *; | [Y]CN1738787 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * claim 1 *; | [Y]CN103450287 (SHANDONG HUAYI CORN TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-20* claim 1 *; | [Y]CN104356007 (LIAONING SHIXING PHARMACEUTICAL AND CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * claim 1 *; | [Y]CN105906126 (SHUANGLIANG ECO-ENERGY SYSTEMS CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * claim 1 *; | [Y]CN108658353 (SHIJIAZHUANG GONGDA TECH DEVELOPMENT CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * claim 1 * | by applicant | US5135734 | US6180074 |