EP3957431 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HOLLOW CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Light Metal Company, Ltd. 1-1-13 Shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 1050004 / JP | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEO, Nobushiro c/o Nikkei Research & Development Center NIPPON LIGHT METAL COMPANY, LTD. 1-34-1, Kambara Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-3203 / JP | 02 /
OIKAWA, Keita c/o Nikkei Research & Development Center NIPPON LIGHT METAL COMPANY, LTD. 1-34-1, Kambara Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-3203 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Ryo c/o Nikkei Research & Development Center NIPPON LIGHT METAL COMPANY, LTD. 1-34-1, Kambara Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-3203 / JP | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/08] | 01 /
SEO, Nobushiro c/o Nikkei Research & Development Center, NIPPON LIGHT METAL COMPANY, LTD., 1-34-1, Kambara Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-3203 / JP | ||
02 /
OIKAWA, Keita c/o Nikkei Research & Development Center, NIPPON LIGHT METAL COMPANY, LTD., 1-34-1, Kambara Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-3203 / JP | |||
03 /
YOSHIDA, Ryo c/o Nikkei Research & Development Center, NIPPON LIGHT METAL COMPANY, LTD., 1-34-1, Kambara Shimizu-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 421-3203 / JP | Representative(s) | Kiwit, Benedikt Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | Kiwit, Benedikt Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20809380.7 | 07.02.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020JP04920 | Priority number, date | JP20190093483 | 17.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019093483 | JP20190093484 | 17.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019093484 | [2022/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020235149 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957431 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/12, B23K20/16, B23K20/233 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
B23K20/128 (EP);
B23K20/125 (KR);
B23K20/1225 (US);
B23K20/1255 (US);
B23K20/127 (KR);
B23K20/22 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/08] | B23K20/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOHLEN BEHÄLTERS | [2022/08] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HOLLOW CONTAINER | [2022/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UN RÉCIPIENT CREUX | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2021 | Translation filed | 15.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 13.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000237881 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * claims 1-5 * * figures 5,6,7 *; | [A]CN105108311 (HE FENG, et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [A]EP3260230 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * claim 1 * * claim 3 * * figures 3-4 * | International search | [A]US2003075584 (SARIK DANIEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0025]-[0030], fig. 2, 3 *; | [A]JP2006061983 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0033]-[0036], fig. 1-3 *; | [A]WO2016132768 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-11* , paragraphs [0021]-[0037], fig. 1-3 * | by applicant | JP2007083242 |