EP3973566 - SIXNY AS A NUCLEATION LAYER FOR SICXOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lam Research Corporation 4650 Cushing Parkway Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUAN, Guangbi 15990 SW Catbird Lane Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | 02 /
GONG, Bo 16003 SW Windrow Lane Sherwood, Oregon 97140 / US | 03 /
NARKEVICIUTE, Ieva 1070 Fremont Street Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 04 /
VARADARAJAN, Bhadri 16675 SW Hart Road Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | 05 /
LAI, Fengyuan 8900 SW Sweek Drive, Apt. 1727 Tualatin, Oregon 97062 / US | 06 /
MCKERROW, Andrew 2640 Palisades Crest Drive Lake Oswego, Oregon 97034 / US | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20809415.1 | 05.05.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020US31516 | Priority number, date | US201962850343P | 20.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962850343 P | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020236425 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3973566 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/02, C23C16/02, C23C16/32, C23C16/455, C23C16/46 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
H01L21/02126 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/02304 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/022 (CN,KR,US);
C23C16/45536 (EP,US);
C23C16/0272 (EP,US);
C23C16/30 (CN);
C23C16/325 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/345 (CN,KR,US);
C23C16/466 (EP,US);
C23C16/50 (CN,KR,US);
H01L21/02167 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/0217 (CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | H01L21/02, C23C16/34, C23C16/32, C23C16/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | SIXNY ALS EINE NUKLEIERUNGSSCHICHT FÜR SICXOY | [2022/13] | English: | SIXNY AS A NUCLEATION LAYER FOR SICXOY | [2022/13] | French: | SIXNY UTILISÉ EN TANT QUE COUCHE DE NUCLÉATION POUR SICXOY | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 17.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6764952 (YU JENGYI [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * columns 3-7; figures 1-6 * [I] 6; | [XI]US2006046479 (RAJAGOPALAN NAGARAJAN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0125]; figure 3 *[I] 6 | International search | [A]US2013330935 (VARADARAJAN BHADRI [US])[A] 1-20; | [A]KR101779097B [A] 1-20; | [A]US2018323055 (WOODRUFF JACOB HUFFMAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]JP2018182322 (LAM RES CORP) [A] 1-20; | [A]WO2018213018 (ASM IP HOLDING BV [NL]) [A] 1-20 |