EP3975283 - SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Mun Sung 150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | Shearman, James Ward Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20809474.8 | 19.05.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020KR06547 | Priority number, date | KR20190060097 | 22.05.2019 Original published format: KR 20190060097 | [2022/13] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020235916 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3975283 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0587, H01M10/052, H01M50/107, H01M50/152, H01M50/342, H01M50/533 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/538 (CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0422 (CN,US);
H01M10/0431 (CN);
H01M10/0525 (CN);
H01M10/0587 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/107 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/152 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/342 (CN,US);
H01M50/3425 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/528 (KR,US);
H01M50/533 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | H01M2/26, H01M2/12, H01M2/22, H01M2/04, H01M10/0587, H01M10/052, H01M2/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2022/13] | English: | SECONDARY BATTERY | [2022/13] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2021 | Translation filed | 22.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1076371 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [XYI]US2005260489 (KIM HYON-SOK [KR]); | [Y]US2008182159 (MITANI TAKAYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2009136835 (NAKAI KENJI [JP], et al) | International search | [XY]KR20050110460 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2006338981 (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY); | [A]JP2008130482 (HITACHI VEHICLE ENERGY LTD); | [Y]KR20090099273 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20090110710 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) |