EP3972667 - FLOW SYNCHRONIZATION DEVICES, METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NxStage Medical, Inc. 350 Merrimack Street 7th Floor Lawrence, MA 01843 / US | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAMES, Jerome Vestavia, Alabama 35226 / US | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20809725.3 | 22.05.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020US34420 | Priority number, date | US201962851922P | 23.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962851922 P | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020237228 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3972667 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/34 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
A61M1/341 (EP,US);
A61M1/1603 (US);
A61M1/3441 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | A61M1/16, A61M1/14, A61M1/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | FLUSSSYNCHRONISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME | [2022/13] | English: | FLOW SYNCHRONIZATION DEVICES, METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2022/13] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, PROCÉDÉS, ET SYSTÈMES DE SYNCHRONISATION D'ÉCOULEMENT | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 09.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018017623 (NXSTAGE MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0255] ** the whole document * | International search | [A]US2001016699 (BURBANK JEFFREY H [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]US2005126961 (BISSLER JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]US2017258979 (FULKERSON BARRY NEIL [US], et al) [A] 1-12* entire document *; | [X]WO2018017623 (NXSTAGE MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * entire document * |