EP3969262 - LAYER TRANSFUSION SEQUENCING FOR SELECTIVE DEPOSITION-BASED ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evolve Additive Solutions, Inc. 5600 Rowland Road, Suite 180 Minnetonka, MN 55343 / US | For all designated states Farah, Zeiter 4009 Harriet Ave Minneapolis, MN 55409 / US | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATCHELDER, J. Samuel 2 Campbell Drive Somers, New York 10589 / US | 02 /
BOORUGU, Manish 1220 SE Brook Ave. Unit 117 Minneapolils, Minnesota 55414 / US | 03 /
FARAH, Zeiter 4009 Harriet Ave Minneapolis, Minnesota 55409 / US | [2022/35] |
Former [2022/12] | 01 /
BATCHELDER, J. Samuel 2 Campbell Drive Somers New York 10589 / US | ||
02 /
BOORUGU, Manish 1220 SE Brook Ave. Unit 117 Minneapolils, Minnesota 55414 / US | |||
03 /
FARAH, Zeiter 4009 Harriet Ave Minneapolis, MN 55409 / US | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20810103.0 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020US33175 | Priority number, date | US201962849213P | 17.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962849213 P | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020236610 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3969262 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/147, B29C64/393, B33Y10/00, B33Y50/02 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
B29C64/147 (EP);
B29C64/393 (EP,US);
B29C64/176 (US);
B29C64/194 (US);
B29C64/245 (US);
B29C64/295 (US);
B29C64/364 (US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y50/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/12] | B29C64/393, B29C64/176, B29C64/194, B29C64/295, B29C64/245, B29C67/00, B33Y10/00, B33Y40/00, B33Y30/00, B33Y50/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | SCHICHTTRANSFUSIONSSEQUENZIERUNG ZUR SELEKTIVEN ABSCHEIDUNGSBASIERTEN GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG | [2022/12] | English: | LAYER TRANSFUSION SEQUENCING FOR SELECTIVE DEPOSITION-BASED ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING | [2022/12] | French: | SÉQUENÇAGE DE TRANSFUSION DE COUCHE POUR FABRICATION ADDITIVE À BASE DE DÉPÔT SÉLECTIF | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 10.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2013075022 (CHILLSCYZN STEVEN A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,11-13 * paragraphs [0022] , [0065] , [0076] , [0078] , [0114] - [0116]; figures 1,5A-E * [A] 5,9,14,15[I] 7,8,10 | International search | [A]US2013075022 (CHILLSCYZN STEVEN A [US], et al) [A] 1,13,21-22; | [A]US2015024169 (MARTIN TREVOR I [CA]) [A] 1,13,21-22; | [A]EP3231580 (XEROX CORP [US])[A] 1,13,21-22; | [A]US2017355135 (TOMBS THOMAS NATHANIEL [US]) [A] 1,13,21-22; | [A]WO2019028030 (EVOLVE ADDITIVE SOLUTIONS INC [US]) [A] 1,13,21-22 | by applicant | US2011186081 | US8123999 | US8246888 | US8459280 | US8488994 | US2013186549 | US2013186558 | US8765045 | US8879957 |