EP4061639 - ACTIVE INGREDIENT SACHET, METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT SACHET, AND USE OF AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT SACHET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNING, Ingomar Krahm 9a 51588 Nümbrecht / DE | 02 /
HEBERLEIN, Walter Erdbergstraße 17/1/6 1030 Wien (GKZ 90001) / AT | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20810895.1 | 18.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020EP82456 | Priority number, date | DE201910131454 | 21.11.2019 Original published format: DE102019131454 | [2022/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021099341 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4061639 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B32B37/22, C11D17/00, B65D65/46 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
B32B37/226 (EP);
B32B37/0076 (EP);
B65B11/52 (EP);
B65B29/00 (EP);
B65B9/042 (EP);
C11D17/045 (EP);
B29C2793/0009 (EP);
B29C2793/009 (EP);
B29C2795/007 (EP);
B29C51/082 (EP);
B29C51/266 (EP);
B29C51/445 (EP);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/242 (EP);
B29C66/24221 (EP);
B29C66/24225 (EP);
B29C66/24244 (EP);
B29C66/433 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/73793 (EP);
B29C66/849 (EP);
B32B2305/34 (EP);
B32B2439/46 (EP);
B32B37/025 (EP);
B32B37/04 (EP);
B32B38/0004 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2029/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | WIRKSTOFFSACHET, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WIRKSTOFFSACHETS UND VERWENDUNG EINES WIRKSTOFFSACHETS | [2022/39] | English: | ACTIVE INGREDIENT SACHET, METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT SACHET, AND USE OF AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT SACHET | [2022/39] | French: | SACHET DE PRINCIPE ACTIF, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN SACHET DE PRINCIPE ACTIF ET UTILISATION D'UN SACHET DE PRINCIPE ACTIF | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 03.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/25] | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6328951 (WHITE MICHAEL JOHN ROBERT [NL], et al) [Y] 13 * column 3, line 17 - line 24 *; | [XI]EP1375637 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,6-12,14 * paragraph [0073] * * claim 1 * [I] 4,5; | [XI]US2004172917 (DUFFIELD JOHN PAUL [GB]) [X] 1-3,6-12,14 * paragraph [0092] * * claim 1 * [I] 4,5; | [XYI]WO2014198391 (RKW SE [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-12,14 * paragraphs [0013] , [ 0024] * * figure 6 * * claim 9 * [Y] 13 [I] 4,5; | [XI]WO2017140515 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-12,14 * paragraph [0001] * * page 5, paragraph 6 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 4,5; | [XI]US2018282672 (MEIER FRANK [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-12,14 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] *[I] 4,5 |