EP4069003 - AEROSOL-GENERATING ARTICLE COMPRISING A HOLLOW TUBE SEGMENT COMPRISING POLYHYDROXYALKANOATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JORDIL, Yves Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
PAPAKYRILLOU, Stefanos Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/41] | Civera, Andrea Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20811357.1 | 26.11.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020EP83556 | Priority number, date | EP20190386052 | 03.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19386052 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021110541 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4069003 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4069003 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/06, A24D3/08, A24D3/17 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
A24D3/17 (EP,KR,US);
A24D3/068 (EP,KR,US);
A24D1/045 (KR,US);
A24D1/20 (KR,US);
A24D3/02 (US);
A24D3/063 (KR,US);
A24D3/08 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGENDER ARTIKEL MIT EINEM HOHLROHRSEGMENT MIT POLYHYDROXYALKANOAT | [2022/41] | English: | AEROSOL-GENERATING ARTICLE COMPRISING A HOLLOW TUBE SEGMENT COMPRISING POLYHYDROXYALKANOATE | [2022/41] | French: | ARTICLE DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL COMPRENANT UN SEGMENT DE TUBE CREUX COMPORTANT UN POLYHYDROXYALCANOATE | [2023/47] |
Former [2022/41] | ARTICLE DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL COMPRENANT UN SEGMENT DE TUBE CREUX COMPRENANT DU POLYHYDROXYALCANOATE | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 23.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2012000480 (SEBASTIAN ANDRIES D [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [Y]WO2014102095 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, line 5 - line 12 * * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 11 * * page 8, line 35 - page 9, line 13 * * page 10, line 5 - line 15 * * page 10, line 33 - page 11, line 6 *; | [A]WO2014102094 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 10 * * page 7, line 19 - line 24 ** page 10, line 18 - line 34 *; | [A]WO2017055500 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * page 6, line 11 - line 17 * * page 8, line 10 - line 25 * | Examination | EP3556230 | by applicant | WO2012164009 | US2016128378 |