EP4061920 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPTIMISING GREEN MALT FOR A BREWING PROCESS AND THE OBTAINED GREEN MALT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BW Procestechniek, Naamloze Vennootschap Industriestraat 7A 2500 Lier / BE | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPELLE, Gert Mortselsesteenweg 162 2540 Hove / BE | 02 /
AERTS, Guido Oostveld Kouter 29 9920 Lievegem / BE | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael NV Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Van hunsel, Lieven M.S., et al Archimedes Patents Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 20811729.1 | 03.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020IB60303 | Priority number, date | BE20190005802 | 20.11.2019 Original published format: BE 201905802 | [2022/39] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021099867 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4061920 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12C1/02, A23L7/10, B02C7/13, B02C9/02, B02C18/00 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
C12C1/02 (EP,US);
A23L7/198 (EP);
B02C9/02 (EP,US);
B02C9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTIMIERUNG VON GRÜNMALZ FÜR BRAUVERFAHREN UND DAS ERHALTENE GRÜNMALZ | [2022/39] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPTIMISING GREEN MALT FOR A BREWING PROCESS AND THE OBTAINED GREEN MALT | [2022/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'OPTIMISATION DU MALT VERT POUR UN PROCÉDÉ D'INFUSION ET MALT VERT OBTENU | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 24.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]GB190914266 (ELMASSIAN PAUL HOVSEP [TR]) [X] 19 * claims 1,2 * [A] 1-9 [I] 10,18; | [IA]JPH0929115 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [I] 10-17 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-10 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0038]; claims 1-10 *[A] 1-9,18,19; | [XAI]EP1468738 (LEBENDIGES BROT GMBH [DE]) [X] 10 * paragraph [0165] - paragraph [0168] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0138]; figures 4,5; claims 27-32 * [A] 1-9,18,19 [I] 11-17; | [XAI]KR20130112459 (HONG DO UI [KR], et al) [X] 10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036]; figure 5 * [A] 1-9,18,19 [I] 11-17; | [XAI]CN105013562 (ZHOU XINLIN) [X] 10,16 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * [A] 1-9,18,19 [I] 11-15,17; | [XAI] - S R Duff ET AL, "COMMUNICATIONS USE OF GREEN MALT IN BREWING", (1963), page 249, URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/pdfdirect/10.1002/j.2050-0416.1963.tb01925.x, XP055716699 [X] 19 * Conclusion;; tables 1-6 * * page 250, column lh, paragraph 1 * * page 250, column rh, paragraph last - page 252, paragraph 1 * [A] 1-9 [I] 10,18 | [XAI] - I. C. MACWILLIAM ET AL, "WORT FROM GREEN MALT AND UNMALTED CEREALS", JOURNAL OF THE INSTITUTE OF BREWING., GB, (19630708), vol. 69, no. 4, doi:10.1002/j.2050-0416.1963.tb01930.x, ISSN 0046-9750, pages 303 - 308, XP055716874 [X] 19 * page 303, column lh, paragraph 2 - column rh, paragraph 1; table 5 * [A] 1-9 [I] 18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/j.2050-0416.1963.tb01930.x | by applicant | US3446708 |