EP4238349 - CONGESTION CONTROL BASED INTER-GNB CARRIER AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCHARDY, Geoffrey Carp, Ontario K0A 7L0 / CA | 02 /
SHAH, Samir Ottawa, Ontario K1Z 1E1 / CA | 03 /
GHIMIRE, Jagadish K2S 0N1 Stittsville, Ontario / CA | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Koitel, Raivo, et al Koitel Patent & Trademark Agency Tina 26-2 10126 Tallinn / EE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/36] | Laqua, Bernd Christian Kurt Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20812132.7 | 30.10.2020 | [2023/36] | WO2020IB60236 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022090783 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4238349 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/02, H04W28/06, H04W28/10 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
H04W28/065 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04W28/0268 (EP,US);
H04W28/0289 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (US);
H04W72/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | ÜBERLASTUNGSSTEUERUNG AUF BASIS VON INTER-GNB-TRÄGERAGGREGATION | [2023/36] | English: | CONGESTION CONTROL BASED INTER-GNB CARRIER AGGREGATION | [2023/36] | French: | AGRÉGATION DE PORTEUSES INTER-GNB BASÉE SUR LE CONTRÔLE DE L'ENCOMBREMENT | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 19.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009129265 (YE FENGJI [US], et al); | [A]WO2020036928 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [X]US2020314816 (YI YUNJUNG [US], et al) |