EP4052296 - TEXTURING FOR HIGH DENSITY PIXELATED-LED CHIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Creeled, Inc. 4400 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDREWS, Peter Scott 221 Continental Drive Durham, North Carolina 27703 / US | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20812168.1 | 29.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020US57955 | Priority number, date | US201962927504P | 29.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962927504 P | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021087109 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4052296 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/15, H01L33/24, H01L33/20 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H01L27/156 (EP);
H01L33/08 (US);
H01L25/0753 (EP);
H01L33/20 (EP);
H01L33/24 (US);
H01L33/387 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | TEXTURIERUNG FÜR CHIPS MIT HOCHDICHTER PIXELLIERTER LED | [2022/36] | English: | TEXTURING FOR HIGH DENSITY PIXELATED-LED CHIPS | [2022/36] | French: | TEXTURATION POUR PUCES À DEL PIXELISÉES À HAUTE DENSITÉ | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 27.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/18] | 03.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP2197051 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 47,67,85-89,93* paragraph [0075]; figures 19A-19B *; | [X]US2011294240 (KIM YU-SIK [KR]) [X] 1,10,12-15,22-24,34-36,46,48,52,54-57,67,68,79,81-84,91,92 * paragraph [0056]; figure 1C * * paragraphs [0034] - [0043] *; | [XI]US2017294418 (EDMOND JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-14,16-20,22-31,34-36,38-46,48-62,67,68,76-89,91,92 * paragraphs [0217] - [0218]; figure 7A * * paragraphs [0250] - [0252]; figure 17 * * paragraphs [0187] - [0188] * [I] 33,37; | [XAY]US2019074266 (ANDREWS PETER SCOTT [US]) [X] 45,46,52-66,90 * paragraphs [0231] - [0249]; figures 15A-15I, 16A * [A] 21,32,37,68-75 [Y] 47,67,85-89,93 | by applicant | US2017098746 |