EP4069059 - REFERENCE LOCATION VISUALIZATION FOR ELECTROYPHYSIOLOGICAL MAPPING, AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IBRAGIMOV, Zalman c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KARASENTI, David c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
SCHWARTZ, Yitzhack c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property and Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20812351.3 | 01.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020EP84029 | Priority number, date | EP20190213217 | 03.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19213217 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021110630 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4069059 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/06, A61B5/287 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
A61B5/743 (EP);
A61B34/20 (US);
A61B5/061 (US);
A61B5/063 (EP);
A61B5/287 (EP,US);
A61B5/339 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | REFERENZORTVISUALISIERUNG FÜR DIE ELEKTROPHYSIOLOGISCHE KARTIERUNG SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2022/41] | English: | REFERENCE LOCATION VISUALIZATION FOR ELECTROYPHYSIOLOGICAL MAPPING, AND ASSOCIATED DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS | [2022/41] | French: | VISUALISATION D'EMPLACEMENT DE RÉFÉRENCE POUR UNE CARTOGRAPHIE ÉLECTROPHYSIOLOGIQUE, ET DISPOSITIFS, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 04.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US5983126 | US6002955 | US10278616 | EP20190206883 |