EP3978362 - FLYING OBJECT, FLYING OBJECT SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR PAINTING OBJECT TO BE PAINTED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATSUMURA Nobuhito c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
UHARA Osamu c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20812793.6 | 08.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020JP18611 | Priority number, date | JP20190100062 | 29.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019100062 | [2022/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020241198 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3978362 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B64C13/20, B64C17/08, B64C39/02, B64D1/18, B64F3/00, B05B17/00, B05B12/14, B64U101/00, B64U10/13, // B05B7/24 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
B64D1/18 (EP,US);
B05B13/005 (US);
B05B12/1472 (EP);
B64C17/08 (EP);
B64F3/00 (EP);
B64U10/13 (EP);
B05B7/2491 (EP);
B64U2101/28 (EP,US);
B64U2101/45 (EP);
B64U30/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | B64C13/20, B64C17/08, B64C39/02, B64D1/18, B64F3/00, B05B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | FLUGOBJEKT, FLUGOBJEKTSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM LACKIEREN VON ZU LACKIERENDEN GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2022/14] | English: | FLYING OBJECT, FLYING OBJECT SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR PAINTING OBJECT TO BE PAINTED | [2022/14] | French: | OBJET VOLANT, SYSTÈME D'OBJET VOLANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PEINTURE D'UN OBJET À PEINDRE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2021 | Translation filed | 03.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 07.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2015274294 (DAHLSTROM ROBERT L [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10,13-15 * paragraph [0040]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0045] * [A] 7,11 [I] 3,6; | [A]US2017113787 (HEIN KIM F [US]) [A] 1* paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030] *; | [X]US2017200530 (DAVIS CODY R [US], et al) [X] 1,8,9,12,13 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] *; | [X]FR3048415 (FROIDURE THIERRY [FR]) [X] 1,5,8,13 * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 4; figure 3 *; | [X]CN107503502 (SUSONG JIAYI DECORATION CO LTD) [X] 1,13 * paragraph [0030]; figures 1-2 *; | [A]US10195629 (DAHLSTROM ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0116] *; | [X]EP3476733 (AIRBUS HELICOPTERS [FR]) [X] 1,13 * paragraph [0068]; figures 1,2,5 * * paragraph [0098] *; | [XP]WO2019200497 (MURA YANEZ MIGUEL ANGEL [CL]) [XP] 1,9,13 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0084]; figures 20, 26 * | International search | [Y]CN204507277U (MAANSHAN SAIDI INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 2-3 * paragraphs [0033], [0035], fig. 1, 3-4 *; | [XYA]US2015274294 (DAHLSTROM ROBERT L [US]) [X] 1,4,8,13-15 * paragraphs [0038], [0041], [0045], [0051]-[0052], [0062], [0065], fig. 3, 7 * [Y] 2-3 [A] 6-7,11; | [YA]WO2016181426 (SKYROBOT INC [JP]) [Y] 1,5,8,13-15 * abstract, fig. 1 * [A] 6-7,11; | [Y]CN205971855U (ZHENG JIANHUI) [Y] 2-3 * paragraphs [0029]-[0031], [0039], fig. 1-2 *; | [XA]US2017200530 (DAVIS CODY R [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,12 [A] 6-7,11; | [A]CN107902081 (YAN QIUTAO) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0036], [0038], fig. 1 *; | [YA]JP2018090096 (ENROUTEMS CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1,5,8,13-15 * paragraphs [0017]-[0019], [0050], fig. 1-2 * [A] 6-7,11; | [Y]CN208412142U (HUNAN DAZHONG CONSTRUCTION ENG CO LTD) [Y] 2-3 * paragraphs [0046], [0048], fig. 1-3, 10-12 *; | [PX]JP2019122893 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [PX] 1,4,8-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0015], [0024], [0029], fig. 1 * | by applicant | JPH0524584 |