EP3977455 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina, Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIU, Merek 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 02 /
AGAH, Ali 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 03 /
HONG, Stanley 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 04 /
KHURANA, Tarun 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 05 /
KARUNAKARAN, Aathavan 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 06 /
CIESLA, Craig 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 07 /
KIA, Amirali 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/14] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20813443.7 | 26.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020US34517 | Priority number, date | US201962855610P | 31.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962855610 P | US201962855682P | 31.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962855682 P | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020243076 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977455 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G11C13/00, // G11C13/02, G11C13/04, G11C29/02, G11C29/04, G11C29/44, G11C29/52 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
G11C13/0019 (EP);
B01L3/50855 (US);
G11C13/003 (EP);
G11C13/02 (EP,US);
G16B50/30 (US);
B01L2300/0645 (US);
B01L2300/0829 (US);
C12Q1/6869 (US);
G11C13/04 (US);
G11C13/045 (EP);
G11C13/048 (EP);
G11C2029/0409 (EP);
G11C2029/0411 (EP);
G11C29/028 (EP);
G11C29/4401 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | G11C13/04, G11C29/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPEICHERUNG | [2022/14] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR STORAGE | [2022/14] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 21.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2714935 (GENAPSYS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * paragraphs [0135] , [0155] , [0180]; figure 4 * [I] 2-6,9-11; | [XI]US2016273032 (ESFANDYARPOUR HESAAM [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0428]; figures 1-24,29 * [I] 2-6,9-11; | [A]WO2018094115 (CATALOG TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0002] - [0003] - [0067] , [0076]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US5787032 (HELLER MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-93 * Column 5 Line 13 - Column 10 Line 13, Figs. 1-15 *; | [A]WO2014150522 (INTELLIGENT BIO SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-93* Pars. [0015]-[0022], Figs.1-4 * |