EP3979292 - DIRECT-CURRENT CIRCUIT BREAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMURA, Kohei c/o MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
TOYA, Nobumoto c/oMITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20813702.6 | 20.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020JP19864 | Priority number, date | JP20190099017 | 28.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019099017 | [2022/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020241397 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3979292 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01H73/18, H01H33/08, // H01H9/34 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
H01H33/08 (EP);
H01H73/18 (EP);
H01H9/341 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | H01H73/18, H01H33/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | GLEICHSTROMSCHUTZSCHALTER | [2022/14] | English: | DIRECT-CURRENT CIRCUIT BREAKER | [2022/14] | French: | DISJONCTEUR À COURANT CONTINU | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2021 | Translation filed | 17.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 11.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP23151994.3 / EP4187572 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2020113 (INST VYSOKIKH TEMPERATUR AKADE); | [YA]JPH05290682 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [XAYI]US2013037520 (NOISETTE PHILIPPE [FR], et al); | [YA]CN105470067 (ZHEJIANG TENGEN ELECTRIC CO); | [YA]JP6516078B | International search | [Y]JPS63108623 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 11 * page 3, upper left column, line 3 to page 3, upper right column, line 2, page 4, lower left column, line 5 to lower left column, line 11, fig. 1-2, 9 *; | [Y]JPS63257138 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-6, 8, 10-11 * page 2, upper right column, line 5 to page 2, lower left column, line 9, page 3, upper right column, line 1 to page 3, lower right column, line 17, page 4, upper right column, line 11 to page 4, lower left column, line 8, fig. 1, 8-9 *; | [A]JPH0216078B (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.)[A] 1-13; | [YA]JP2003168349 (ENERGY SUPPORT CORP) [Y] 1-6, 8, 10-11 * paragraphs [0011]-[0048], fig. 1-7 * [A] 7, 9, 12-13 | by applicant | JPS61190828 | JPS6282616 |