EP3958201 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR PAYMENT USING VEHICLE DIGITAL KEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ParkingCloud Co., Ltd. (Yangpyeong-dong 2-ga) 1F, 2F, 19 Yeongdeungpo-ro 3-gil Seoul Yeongdeungpo-gu 07276 / KR | [2022/10] |
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states ParkingCloud Co., Ltd. (Yangpyeong-dong 2-ga) 1F, 2F, 19 Yeongdeungpo-ro 3-gil Seoul Yeongdeungpo-gu 07276 / KR | ||
For all designated states Shin, Sang Yong (Gangbyeon Sharmang 1 Danji, Deungchon-dong) 102-dong 1402-ho, 520, Yangcheon-ro Seoul Gangseo-gu 07548 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hwa Jin Misung-apartment, Apgujeong-dong), 29-dong 1501- ho, 113, Apgujeong-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06000 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Sang Yong Gangbyeon Sharmang 1 Danji Deungchon-dong) 102- dong 1402-ho, 520 Yangcheon-ro, Gangseo-gu Seoul 07548 / KR | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20814407.1 | 22.05.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020KR06679 | Priority number, date | KR20190061071 | 24.05.2019 Original published format: KR 20190061071 | [2022/08] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020242140 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958201 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/32, G06Q20/38, G06Q20/34, G06Q50/30 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
G06Q20/322 (EP,KR);
G06Q20/327 (EP,KR);
G06Q20/3278 (US);
G06Q20/3223 (EP);
G06Q20/382 (KR);
G06Q30/0284 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/08] | G06Q20/32, G06Q20/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUR BEZAHLUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES DIGITALEN FAHRZEUGSCHLÜSSELS | [2022/08] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR PAYMENT USING VEHICLE DIGITAL KEY | [2022/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE DE PAIEMENT UTILISANT UNE CLÉ NUMÉRIQUE DE VÉHICULE | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2021 | Translation filed | 19.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 22.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 09.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]KR20110097208 (PARK HAE SUNG [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015199685 (BETANCOURT ERNEST [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2016012327 (WANG JIAN [CN]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0050] *; | [A]US2018174139 (ARORA ANKUR [IN]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2019079812 (HIGHWAY TOLL ADMINISTRATION LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 7 * * page 13, line 8 - line 26 * | International search | [Y]KR20170050194 (SK PLANET CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-17 * See paragraph [0041]; and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20180003974 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-17 * See paragraphs [0023], [0033], [0050]-[0051]; claims 1, 10; and figures 1, 9. *; | [Y]KR20180041490 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 4-5, 12-13 * See paragraphs [0300], [0310]; claim 8; and figure 9. *; | [Y]KR20180090866 (MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [Y] 4, 12 * See paragraph [0037]; and figure 1. *; | [PX]KR102084583B (PARKINGCLOUD CO LTD [KR], et al) [PX] 1-17* See paragraphs [0028]-[0032]; claims 1-8; and figure 1. (The above document is the published document for the earlier application that serves as the basis for claiming priority of the present international application.) * |