EP3977662 - PHASE TRACKING FOR USER EQUIPMENT PAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Yiqing 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
WANG, Xiao Feng 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
XU, Huilin 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20814636.5 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020CN90453 | Priority number, date | WO2019CN89192 | 30.05.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/089192 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020238651 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977662 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L25/02 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04W68/02 (US);
H04L25/0224 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0092 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04L5/0085 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | PHASENNACHFÜHRUNG FÜR BENUTZERGERÄTEFUNKRUF | [2022/14] | English: | PHASE TRACKING FOR USER EQUIPMENT PAGING | [2022/14] | French: | SUIVI DE PHASE POUR RADIOMESSAGERIE D'ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 26.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2018227601 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [I]KR20180136774 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | International search | [A]WO2012103932 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al); | [Y]US2013114756 (JIA YONGKANG [CA], et al); | [A]WO2017026975 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [Y]CN109565429 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); |