EP3978801 - DIFFUSION BODY AND ILLUMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII Yusuke c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
OKAGAKI Satoru c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20814757.9 | 04.02.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020JP04189 | Priority number, date | JP20190098789 | 27.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019098789 | [2022/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020240933 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3978801 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F21V8/00, F21Y105/00, F21Y113/13, F21Y115/10, G02B5/02, F21S2/00, G02B6/00 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
F21V9/02 (EP);
G02B6/0041 (EP,US);
G02B5/02 (US);
G02B5/0242 (EP);
G02B5/0278 (EP);
F21Y2103/10 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | DIFFUSIONSKÖRPER UND BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/14] | English: | DIFFUSION BODY AND ILLUMINATION DEVICE | [2022/14] | French: | CORPS DE DIFFUSION ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2021 | Translation filed | 19.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 21.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2017152397 (COELUX SRL) [X] 1,2,4-10,14 * the whole document * [Y] 15-18 [I] 19,20; | [Y]CN107270177 (COELUX SRL) [Y] 15-18* the whole document *; | [XI]US2018066826 (DI TRAPANI PAOLO [IT], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * [I] 11-13,19,20; | [XYI]WO2019063750 (COELUX SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1,4-10,14 * the whole document * [Y] 15-18 [I] 19,20 | International search | [YA]JP2010123309 (NITTOH KOGAKU KK, et al) [Y] 1-10, 14-18 * , paragraphs [0018]-[0068], fig. 1-14 * [A] 11-13, 19-20; | [YA]JP2012014933 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 6-10, 14-18 * , paragraphs [0081]-[0087], [0102], fig. 9-11 * [A] 11-13, 19-20; | [YA]JP2015207554 (COELUX SRL) [Y] 1-10, 14-18 * , paragraph [0078], fig. 6 * [A] 11-13, 19-20; | [YA]WO2016129486 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-10, 14-18 * , paragraph [0164] * [A] 11-13, 19-20; | [YA]JP2018530134 (COELUX S. R. L.) [Y] 16-18 * , paragraphs [0047]-[0056], fig. 3A-3B *[A] 11-13, 19-20 | by applicant | JP2015207554 |