EP3976814 - METHODS TO IDENTIFY COMPONENTS IN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Sequencing Technology Corporation 780 Dedham Street Suite 800 Canton MA 02021 / US | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Peiming 635 S Cardinal Street Gilbert, Arizona 85296 / US | 02 /
LEI, Ming 6 Marie Avenue Sharon, Massachusetts 02067 / US | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20814921.1 | 27.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020US34759 | Priority number, date | US201962853119P | 27.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962853119 P | US201962861675P | 14.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962861675 P | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020243207 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3976814 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/00, B82Y15/00, G01N27/447 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/48785 (EP,KR);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y15/00 (EP,KR);
G01N27/3278 (KR);
G01N33/48721 (EP,KR);
C12Q2565/531 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2521/101, C12Q2521/543, C12Q2563/116, C12Q2565/607 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON KOMPONENTEN IN NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZEN | [2022/14] | English: | METHODS TO IDENTIFY COMPONENTS IN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES | [2022/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'IDENTIFICATION DE COMPOSANTS DANS DES SÉQUENCES D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 12.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2017123416 (ROSWELL BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,7-15 * paragraph [00156] * * paragraph [00128]; claims 1-13 * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [00370] - paragraph [00394]; examples 8,9 *; | [X]WO2018200687 (ROSWELL BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 4,6 * figure 9 *; | [X]US2019106741 (TURNER STEPHEN [US], et al) [X] 5 * paragraph [0165] ** paragraph [0168]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US2013327644 (TURNER STEPHEN [US], et al) [Y] 7 * Abstract; para [0127] *; | [Y]US2016108002 (ZHANG PEIMING [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * Abstract; para [0004]; para [0009]; para [0011]; para [0029]; para [0055-0056]; para [0066] *; | [Y]US2016265047 (VAN ROOYEN PIETER [US], et al) [Y] 9* Abstract; Claim 1; para [0017] *; | [Y]WO2017189930 (QUANTUM BIOSYSTEMS INC [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * Abstract; Claim 1; Claim 8; para [0005-0006]; para [0009]; para [0015]; para [0020]; para [0050]; para [0056]; para [0080]; para [0097]; para [0106]; para [0216]; para [0234]; para [0303]; para [0341]; para [0355] * |