EP3977122 - FILTER TOXIN AND ANTIGEN DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kamradt, Brian 7825 Wedgefield Drive Indianapolis, Indiana 46217 / US | For all designated states Zeller, Chris 75 Wheatmore Court Springboro, OH 45066 / US | For all designated states Zeller, Charles 804 North Rio Vista Boulevard Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 / US | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Sanger, Phillip Simon GWIP Ltd Highdown House 11 Highdown Road Leamington Spa Leamington Spa CV31 1XT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/14] | Sanger, Phillip Simon GWIP Ltd Highdown House 11 Highdown Road Leamington Spa Leamington Spa CV31 1XT / GB | Application number, filing date | 20815465.8 | 28.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020US35006 | Priority number, date | US201962853703P | 28.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962853703 P | US201962865923P | 24.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962865923 P | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020243369 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977122 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N1/22, G01N21/78, F24F110/50, G01N33/00, G01N1/02, G01N33/543, G01N33/569, G01N15/06 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
G01N1/2205 (EP,US);
G01N33/54388 (EP,US);
G01N15/0618 (US);
G01N15/0625 (EP);
G01N33/569 (EP);
G01N2001/2223 (EP,US);
G01N2015/0038 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | G01N33/53, G01N1/22, G01N21/78, F24F110/50, G01N33/00, G01N1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | FILTERTOXIN UND ANTIGENDETEKTOR | [2022/14] | English: | FILTER TOXIN AND ANTIGEN DETECTOR | [2022/14] | French: | TOXINE DE FILTRE ET DÉTECTEUR D'ANTIGÈNE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 01.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 12.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.08.2022 | 31.05.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03016871 (ACARIS HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS PL [GB], et al); | [X]US2005084893 (HERMAN ROBERT A [US], et al); | [X]US2005260569 (HOUDE MICHEL [CA], et al); | [X]US2006257853 (HERMAN ROBERT [US]) | International search | [Y]US5627041 (SHARTLE ROBERT J [US]); | [Y]US2002192664 (NYGREN HAKAN [SE], et al); | [Y]US2003175993 (TORANTO ANTHONY [US], et al); | [XY]US2005260569 (HOUDE MICHEL [CA], et al); | [Y]US2009255535 (KANZER STEVE H [US]); | [Y]US7723099 (MILLER CARY JAMES [CA], et al); | [Y]US2016025603 (KINDT THOMAS J [US], et al); | [Y]US9357946 (JOHNSON BRADLEY N [US], et al); | [Y]US2016299136 (OZALP VELI CENGIZ [TR], et al) | by applicant | WO03016871 |