EP4251012 - DRINKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states air up group GmbH Bayerstraße 69 80335 München / DE | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÜNGST, Magdalena 81667 München / DE | 02 /
KOPPITZ, Jannis 80333 München / DE | 03 /
JÄGER, Tim 80636 München / DE | 04 /
SCHLANG, Fabian 81925 München / DE | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 20815775.0 | 26.11.2020 | [2023/40] | WO2020EP83477 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022111808 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4251012 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47G19/22, A45F3/16, A47G21/18, A45F3/20 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
A47G19/2266 (EP);
A45F3/20 (EP,US);
A47G21/18 (EP);
A47G21/185 (US);
A47G21/186 (US);
A47G21/188 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | TRINKVORRICHTUNG | [2023/40] | English: | DRINKING DEVICE | [2023/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE BOIRE | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 26.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03013977 (RESTELLI SERGIO [IT], et al) [A] 13 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2006086821 (JUNKEL ERIC J [US], et al) [A] 1,6,11,19 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0082]; figure - *; | [A]DE202018106851U (HEALEY FRANK [DE]) [A] 14,15 * figure 2 *; | [I]WO2019016096 (TEN ACE GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-19 * page 18, line 3 - page 32, line l; figure - *; | [A]US2019059562 (ESCAVA BRENDA [US], et al) [A] 1,6,12,17,19* paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0153]; figure - *; | [I]CN110833293 (HUIDONG GANGDONG PLASTIC RUBBER PRODUCTS CO LTD) [I] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [I]CN210643022U (ZHUHAI SPECIAL ECONOMIC ZONE TECHNIQUE PLASTIC CONTAINER FACTORY CO LTD) [I] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [ID]WO2020126210 (TEN ACE GMBH [DE]) [ID] 1-19 * page 15, line 2 - page 22, line l; figure - * | by applicant | US5635229 | US2008028353 | US8662339 | US2015030726 | WO2020126210 |