EP4077195 - DOOR FRAME OF AN ELEVATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/43] | DOOR FRAME OF A LIFT SYSTEM | ||
[2024/05] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHS, Philipp Schädrüti 14 6043 Adligenswil / CH | 02 /
FERRARIO, Paolo Sonnenbergstrasse 13 8800 Thalwil / CH | 03 /
MARINELLI, Enrico Nordstrasse 19 6300 Zug / CH | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20815800.6 | 27.11.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP83684 | Priority number, date | EP20190218456 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19218456 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021121907 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4077195 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/00, B66B13/30 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B66B13/306 (EP,US);
B66B11/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | TÜRRAHMEN EINER AUFZUGSANLAGE | [2022/43] | English: | DOOR FRAME OF AN ELEVATOR SYSTEM | [2024/05] | French: | CADRE DE PORTE D'UN ASCENSEUR | [2024/05] |
Former [2022/43] | DOOR FRAME OF A LIFT SYSTEM | ||
Former [2022/43] | CADRE DE PORTE POUR UN SYSTÈME D'ASCENSEUR | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 18.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]JPH11335011 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-3,9-13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 7,8,14 [I] 4-6; | [AD]EP1518815 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XA]US2014224591 (GARCIA EDY CHRISTIAN ENCINAS [MX]) [X] 1,9,10,12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] - [0079] * * figures 1-7 * [A] 2-8,11,13,14 | by applicant | EP1518815 |