EP4066257 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING MEDICAL IMAGES USING RELEVANCY RULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blackford Analysis Ltd. Level 4, 160 Causewayside Edinburgh EH9 1PR / GB | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TWEEDIE, Robert John 13 Hillpark Brae Blackhall Edinburgh Lothian E4H 7TD / GB | 02 /
HENDERSON, Paul Am Campus 1/44/9 3400 Klosterneuburg / AT | 03 /
HOUSTON, Keith 54 Beaumont Road Birmingham West Midlands B30 2DY / GB | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20816435.0 | 26.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020EP83558 | Priority number, date | US201916695612 | 26.11.2019 Original published format: US201916695612 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021105312 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4066257 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G16H30/20 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G16H10/00 (EP);
G16H30/40 (US);
G16H40/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERARBEITEN MEDIZINISCHER BILDER UNTER VERWENDUNG VON RELEVANZREGELN | [2022/40] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROCESSING MEDICAL IMAGES USING RELEVANCY RULES | [2022/40] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES MÉDICALES À L'AIDE DE RÈGLES DE PERTINENCE | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 01.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Divisional application(s) | EP22176868.2 / EP4123661 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2011010192 (BACKHAUS BRENT [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] , [ 0026]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US2016378917 (SHARAFSHAHI ARMAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 1 * |