EP4069203 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING ELTROMBOPAG BIS(MONOETHANOLAMINE) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthon B.V. Microweg 22 6545 CM Nijmegen / NL | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOGUEIRAS NIETO, Luis Synthon Hispania S.L. Castello 1 Poligono Las Salinas 08830 Sant Boi de Llobregat / ES | 02 /
ALVAREZ FERNANDEZ, Lisardo Synthon Hispania S.L. Castello 1 Poligono Las Salinas 08830 Sant Boi de Llobregat / ES | 03 /
KUMAR, Rohit Synthon Hispania S.L. Castello 1 Poligono Las Salinas 08830 Sant Boi de Llobregat / ES | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Mendivil Gil, Maria Dolores Synthon B.V. P.O. Box 7071 6503 GN Nijmegen / NL | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20816500.1 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020EP84690 | Priority number, date | EP20190214278 | 06.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19214278 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021110942 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4069203 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K31/4152, A61P7/00 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K31/4152 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (US);
A61K47/32 (US);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61K9/2077 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ELTROMBOPAG-BIS(MONOETHANOLAMIN) | [2022/41] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING ELTROMBOPAG BIS(MONOETHANOLAMINE) | [2022/41] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT DE L'ELTROMBOPAG BIS(MONOÉTHANOLAMINE) | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 06.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/26] | 15.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2018197088 (TIEFENBACHER ALFRED E GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [YD] 1-16 * page 1, lines 2-7 * * page 3, lines 11-20 * * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 16 * * page 6, lines 2-16 * * page 9, paragraph last * * page 12, lines 7-16 * * example - * * claims 1, 3, 5, 7, 9, 10 *; | [A]CN109893503 (WUHAN WUYAO SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 0004 * * page 5, paragraph 0010 - page 6, paragraph 0020 * * example - ** claim - *; | [Y]US2019201345 (FUJINO AKIHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * example 16 * * page 2, paragraph 0023 * * page 4, paragraph 0040 * * claim - * | by applicant | WO0189457 | WO2008136843 | WO2015029074 | CN107693515 | WO2018197088 | WO2019086725 |