EP4048231 - TREATMENT OF PANCREATIC CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXACT THERAPEUTICS AS Ullernchausséen 64 0379 Oslo / NO | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONTUM, Per Christian Eilert Sundtsgate 17 A 0259 Oslo / NO | 02 /
HEALEY, Andrew John Solborgveien 17 1528 Moss / NO | 03 /
KVÅLE, Svein Gamle Kroervei 83 1435 Ås / NO | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Bryn Aarflot AS Patent Stortingsgata 8 0161 Oslo / NO | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20816647.0 | 23.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020NO50260 | Priority number, date | NO20190001277 | 25.10.2019 Original published format: NO 20191277 | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021080438 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4048231 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/107, A61K9/50, A61K31/337, A61K31/7068, A61P35/00 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
A61K9/0009 (EP,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61K9/5015 (EP,US);
A61N7/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/337, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4745, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON BAUCHSPEICHELDRÜSENKREBS | [2022/35] | English: | TREATMENT OF PANCREATIC CANCER | [2022/35] | French: | TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU PANCRÉAS | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 21.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2015047103 (PHOENIX SOLUTIONS AS [NO]) [YD] 1-24* the whole document *; | [XD] - KOTOPOULIS SPIROS ET AL, "Sonoporation with Acoustic Cluster Therapy (ACT ) induces transient tumour volume reduction in a subcutaneous xenograft model of pancreatic ductal adenocarcinoma", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20161118), vol. 245, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2016.11.019, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 70 - 80, XP029877442 [XD] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2016.11.019 | [Y] - SCHULTZ CHRISTOPHER W ET AL, "Selecting the Optimal Parameters for Sonoporation of Pancreatic Cancer in a Pre-Clinical Model", 2019 IEEE INTERNATIONAL ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM (IUS), IEEE, (20191006), doi:10.1109/ULTSYM.2019.8925889, pages 328 - 331, XP033671248 [Y] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.2019.8925889 | [Y] - DIMCEVSKI GEORG ET AL, "A human clinical trial using ultrasound and microbubbles to enhance gemcitabine treatment of inoperable pancreatic cancer", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20161012), vol. 243, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2016.10.007, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 172 - 181, XP029862770 [Y] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2016.10.007 | by applicant | WO9416379 | EP0727225 | WO9639197 | WO9953963 | WO2015047103 | - S. KOTOPOULIS et al., "Acoustic Cluster Therapy (ACT@) induces transient tumour volume reduction in a subcutaneous xenograft model of pancreatic ductal adenocarcinoma", J Control Release, (20160000), vol. 245, doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2016.11.019, pages 70 - 80, XP029877442 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2016.11.019 | - Acoustic Output Measurement Standard for Diagnostic Ultrasound Equipmen, American Institute of Ultrasound in Medicine, (20030000), vol. 1998 | - J Gastrointest Oncol, (20180200), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 180 - 195 | - HILMI et al., World J Gastroenterol, vol. 24, pages 2137 - 2151 | - SONTUM et al., International Journal of Pharmaceutics, (20150000), vol. 495, pages 1019 - 1027 | - HINGORANI et al., Cancer Cell, vol. 7, pages 469 - 483 | - LEE et al., Curr Protoc Pharmacol, vol. 73, pages 143911 - 143920 |