EP4058829 - SLEEP-AIDING EYEWEAR WITH IMPROVED VISIBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | 12.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dreamers Holdings, Inc. 903/321 Wythe Avenue Brooklyn, New York 11249 / US | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEEHAN, Stafford, W. 201 Stoney Hollow Road Tiverton, Rhode Island 02878 / US | 02 /
STENMARK, Zachary, R. 312 Wythe Avenue S903 Brooklyn, New York 11249 / US | 03 /
STENMARK, Jordan, D. 321 Wythe Avenue S903 Brooklyn, New York 11249 / US | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20817166.0 | 10.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020US59804 | Priority number, date | US201962933521P | 11.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962933521 P | US202063104906P | 23.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063104906 P | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021096840 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4058829 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/10, G02C7/10, G02B5/28, A61F9/02 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
G02B1/10 (EP);
G02C7/104 (EP,US);
A61F9/022 (EP,US);
G02B1/02 (US);
G02B5/285 (EP);
G02B5/289 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | SCHLAFHILFEBRILLE MIT VERBESSERTER SICHT | [2022/38] | English: | SLEEP-AIDING EYEWEAR WITH IMPROVED VISIBILITY | [2022/38] | French: | LUNETTES D'AIDE AU SOMMEIL À VISIBILITÉ AMÉLIORÉE | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 09.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/24] | 12.01.2023 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/24] | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2015338683 (PERRICONE NICHOLAS [US], et al) [Y] 20-34,44-66 * paragraph [0114] * * figure 21 * * claim 15 * * claim 5 * [A] 12-15; | [XYI]US2018321515 (CHENG CHARLES [TW], et al) [X] 1,3,35 * figure 4 * [Y] 44-66 [I] 2,3,36,37,67-70; | [YA]CN109357172 (SHENZHEN GUANGKE HOLOGRAPHIC TECH LIMITED) [Y] 44-51 * Section "Summary of the invention" * [A] 12-15; | [A]EP3457196 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [A] 16,17 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0087] *; | [XYI]US2019172988 (NIMURA SHIGEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 4-11,38-43 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0151] * * paragraph [0165] * [Y] 20-34 [I] 12-19; | [A]US2019258086 (BARRAU CORALIE [FR], et al) [A] 1,4,7* figure 1 * | by applicant | - ALFRED LEWY et al., Science, (19800000), vol. 210, pages 1267 - 1269 | - GEORGE BRAINARD et al., Brain Research, (19840000), vol. 294, pages 333 - 339 | - Ann. New York Acad. Sci., (19850000), vol. 453, pages 376 - 378 |