EP3993806 - THIARABINE- AND THIARABINE PRODRUG-BASED TREATMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Southern Research Institute 2000 9th Avenue South Birmingham, Alabama 35205 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOUKHA-CHAFIQ, Omar 5862 Water Branch Rd. Hoover, AL 35244 / US | 02 /
SUTO, Mark J. 402 Devon Drive Homewood, AL 35209 / US | 03 /
LIU, Jie 4254 Hamlin Place Vestavia, AL 35242 / US | 04 /
BOOHAKER, Rebecca 2501 Oneal Circle Birmingham, AL 35226 / US | 05 /
AUGELLI-SZAFRAN, Corinne E. Homewood, AL 35209 / US | [2022/39] |
Former [2022/19] | 01 /
MOUKHA-CHAFIQ, Omar 5862 Water Branch Rd. Hoover, AL 35244 / US | ||
02 /
SUTO, Mark J. 402 Devon Drive Homewood, AL 35209 / US | |||
03 /
LIU, Jie 4254 Hamlin Place Vestavia, AL 35242 / US | |||
04 /
BOOHAKER, Rebecca 2501 Oneal Circle Birmingham, AL 35226 / US | Representative(s) | CH Kilger Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Fasanenstraße 29 10719 Berlin / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20817916.8 | 04.06.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020US36125 | Priority number, date | US201962857686P | 05.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962857686 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020247633 | Date: | 10.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993806 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5415, A61K31/7068, A61P35/00, A61K31/708, A61K31/7076 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
C07K16/2818 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/7068 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7076 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K31/708 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K39/3955 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7076, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/708, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/19] | A61K31/5415, A61K31/7068 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | AUF THIARABIN UND THIARABINPRODRUG BASIERENDE BEHANDLUNGEN | [2022/19] | English: | THIARABINE- AND THIARABINE PRODRUG-BASED TREATMENTS | [2022/19] | French: | TRAITEMENTS À BASE DE PROMÉDICAMENT DE THIARABINE ET DE THIARABINE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/19] | 06.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2022/19] | 01.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees HR, CH, IT, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, BG, BE, AT, AL | 31.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 31.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2022 | Decision despatched | 31.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 31.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1100512 (SOUTHERN RES INST [US]) [Y] 1-11,13 * example -; claim - *; | [Y] - DAS SATYA ET AL, "Promising New Agents for Colorectal Cancer", CURRENT TREATMENT OPTIONS IN ONCOLOGY, SPRINGER US, NEW YORK, vol. 19, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S11864-018-0543-Z, ISSN 1527-2729, (20180511), pages 1 - 14, (20180511), XP036515735 [Y] 1-11,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11864-018-0543-z | [Y] - YOSHIMURA Y ET AL, "A facile alternative synthesis of 4-'Thioarabinonucleosides and Their Biological Activities", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19970101), vol. 40, doi:10.1021/JM9701536, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2177 - 2183, XP002174619 [Y] 1-11,13 * whole document, in particular table 2 and scheme 3 (compound 6h) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9701536 | International search | [A]US2005256143 (JEONG LAK S [KR], et al) [A] 5 * ; Abstract p8 *; | [A]US2010237108 (ANDERSON JAMES [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2010324277 (BHAT BALKRISHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document *; | [Y]US2016176962 (MURRIEL CHRISTOPHER LAMOND [US], et al) [Y] 13-14, 19 * ; para[0315] *; | [A]US2017029456 (DOUSSON CYRIL B [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document *; | [XYA]US2018208621 (DOUSSON CYRIL B [FR], et al) [X] 1-4, 6-12, 15-18, 20 * ; para[0012] para[0091] para[0138] para[0324] para[0332] * [Y] 13-14, 19 [A] 5; | [PA]WO2019204637 (SOUTHERN RES INST [US]) [P] 1-20 * ; entire document *[A] 0; | [A] - "4-Amino-1-[(2R,3S,4S,5R)-3,4-dihydroxy-5- (hydroxymethyl)thiolan-2-yl]-1,3,5-triazin-2-one", Pubmed Compound, (20061025), Database accession no. CID 9903306, URL: ncbi, XP055768178 [A] 5 * ; p2 * |