EP4069293 - POLYPEPTIDES COMPRISING IMMUNOGLOBULIN SINGLE VARIABLE DOMAINS TARGETING TNFA AND OX40L [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ablynx NV Technologiepark 21 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | For all designated states SANOFI 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2022/48] |
Former [2022/41] | For all designated states Ablynx N.V. Technologiepark 21 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | ||
For all designated states SANOFI 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROMMELAERE, Heidi c/o Ablynx N.V. Patent Department Technologiepark 21 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | 02 /
BRIGÉ, Ann c/o Ablynx N.V. Patent Department Technologiepark 21 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | 03 /
CORNELIS, Sigrid c/o Ablynx N.V. Patent Department Technologiepark 21 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | 04 /
FLORIAN, Peter c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 05 /
HEYNINCK, Karen c/o Ablynx N.V. Patent Department Technologiepark 21 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | 06 /
KREUTZBERG, Thomas c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 07 /
LEEUW, Thomas c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 08 /
LORENT, Eric c/o Ablynx N.V., Patent Department Technologiepark 21 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | 09 /
SERCAN ALP, Oezen c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 10 /
SIBENHORN, Gertrud c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20819720.2 | 03.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020EP84431 | Priority number, date | US201962944661P | 06.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962944661 P | EP20200305071 | 28.01.2020 Original published format: EP 20305071 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021110817 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4069293 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P1/00, A61P17/06, A61P37/00, A61P29/00, A61P19/02 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
A61P1/00 (EP,IL);
C07K16/2875 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P17/06 (EP,IL);
A61P19/02 (EP,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,IL);
A61P37/06 (EP,IL);
A61P39/00 (KR);
C07K16/18 (EP,IL);
C07K16/241 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/14 (IL,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/565 (IL,US);
C07K2317/569 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/92 (EP,IL);
C07K2317/94 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Validation states | MA | 24.06.2022 | TN | 24.06.2022 | Title | German: | POLYPEPTIDE MIT VARIABLEN IMMUNGLOBULIN-EINZELDOMÄNEN ZUR ABZIELUNG AUF TNFA UND OX40L | [2022/41] | English: | POLYPEPTIDES COMPRISING IMMUNOGLOBULIN SINGLE VARIABLE DOMAINS TARGETING TNFA AND OX40L | [2022/41] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES COMPRENANT DES DOMAINES VARIABLES UNIQUES D'IMMUNOGLOBULINE CIBLANT TNFA ET OX40L | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 24.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2011073180 (ABLYNX NV [BE], et al); | [AD]WO2017081320 (ABLYNX NV [BE]); | by applicant | WO9404678 | WO9634103 | WO9923221 | WO2004041865 | WO2004041862 | WO2006122787 | WO2007118670 | WO2008020079 | WO2011073180 | WO2012175741 | WO2012175400 | WO2015173325 | WO2017080850 | WO2017081320 | WO2017085172 | WO2017134234 | WO2018104444 | WO2018131234 | WO2018134235 | WO2018134234 |