EP4072295 - BAKING ADDITIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINDEISEN, Alexander Krogshoejvej 36q 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | NZ EPO Representatives Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20820163.2 | 09.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020EP85333 | Priority number, date | EP20190214538 | 09.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19214538 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021116198 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4072295 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A21D8/04, A21D10/00 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
A21D10/005 (EP,US);
A21D8/042 (EP,US);
A21D2/165 (US);
A21D2/22 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | BACKZUSATZ | [2022/42] | English: | BAKING ADDITIVE | [2022/42] | French: | ADDITIF DE BOULANGERIE | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 11.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1114436 (SHORT MILLING CO J); | [A]US3506448 (KLEINSCHMIDT ALBERT W, et al); | [A]WO2008023269 (DANISCO [DK], et al); | [AD]US2009317515 (LOHSCHEIDT MARKUS [DE], et al); | [AD]US2010310720 (MITCHELL TOM [US], et al); | [YD]WO2016114648 (MAURI RES B V [NL]); | [IDY]WO2019115669 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]); | by applicant | WO8402921 | EP0867116 | WO9943794 | WO9950399 | US2002028267 | WO2004111217 | WO2005003339 | US2005054065 | WO2006032281 | WO2008148845 | US2009317515 | US2010310720 | WO2016114648 | WO2019115669 |