EP4007914 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR NON-INVASIVELY CHARACTERISING A HETEROGENEOUS MEDIUM USING ULTRASOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUPERSONIC IMAGINE ZAC de l'Enfant 135 Rue Emilien Gautier 13290 Aix en Provence / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states Ecole Supérieure de Physique et de Chimie Industrielles de la Ville de Paris 10 rue Vauquelin 75005 Paris / FR | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERT, William 84 avenue Danielle Casanova 94200 Ivry sur Seine / FR | 02 /
AUBRY, Alexandre 14 rue Saint Just 94200 Ivry sur Seine / FR | 03 /
FINK, Mathias 16 rue Edouard Laferrière 92190 Meudon / FR | 04 /
COBUS, Laura 206 Ethelbert Street Winnipeg, MB, R3G 1V7 / CA | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20820244.0 | 31.07.2020 | [2022/23] | WO2020FR51416 | Priority number, date | FR20190008904 | 02.08.2019 Original published format: FR 1908904 | [2022/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021023933 | Date: | 11.02.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4007914 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/04, A61B8/08, G01N29/06, G01N29/07, G01N29/26, G01N29/44 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
G01N29/043 (EP,KR);
A61B8/4488 (CN,US);
A61B8/0833 (US);
A61B8/5207 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B8/5215 (CN);
G01N29/0654 (EP,KR);
G01N29/07 (EP,KR);
G01N29/262 (EP,KR);
G01N29/4463 (EP,KR);
G01S15/88 (US);
G01S15/8915 (EP,KR);
G01S7/52049 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR NICHTINVASIVEN CHARAKTERISIERUNG EINES HETEROGENEN MEDIUMS MITTELS ULTRASCHALL | [2022/23] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR NON-INVASIVELY CHARACTERISING A HETEROGENEOUS MEDIUM USING ULTRASOUND | [2022/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CARACTÉRISATION ULTRASONORE NON INVASIVE D'UN MILIEU HÉTÉROGÈNE | [2022/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 22.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4817614 (HASSLER DIETRICH [DE], et al); | [X]US5720289 (WRIGHT J NELSON [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2010001027 |