EP4057796 - HYDROPONIC GROWTH SYSTEM AND ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fork Farms Holdings, LLC 1025 Lombardi Avenue Green Bay, WI 54304 / US | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TYINK, Alexander R. 500 East Roosevelt Street Appleton, Wisconsin 54911 / US | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Hartley, Lucinda Jane Hargreaves Elsworth 26 Northumberland Square North Shields, Tyne and Wear NE30 1PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/38] | Hartley, Lucinda Jane Hargreaves Elsworth 26 Northumberland Square North Shields, Tyne&Wear NE30 1PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20820297.8 | 12.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020US60201 | Priority number, date | US201916681092 | 12.11.2019 Original published format: US201916681092 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021097073 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4057796 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/24, A01G31/06 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
A01G9/249 (EP,IL);
A01G31/02 (IL,US);
A01G31/045 (IL,US);
A01G31/06 (EP,IL);
A01G7/045 (IL,US);
A01G9/246 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | HYDROPONISCHES WACHSTUMSSYSTEM UND ANORDNUNG | [2022/38] | English: | HYDROPONIC GROWTH SYSTEM AND ASSEMBLY | [2022/38] | French: | SYSTÈME ET ENSEMBLE DE CROISSANCE HYDROPONIQUE | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 13.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2014137472 (ANDERSON DANA [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-4; | [XI]US2017265408 (MCGOWAN PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3,4; | [XI]US9814186 (ANDERSON DANA [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-4; | [XI]WO2019006019 (UNIV ARIZONA [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3,4; | [AD] - Spacesaver Corporation, "Cannabis Vertical Grow System", (20190101), URL: www.spacesaver.com/grow/, (20210120), XP055767369 [AD] 2-4 * the whole document * |