EP4069853 - CCA GENE FOR VIRUS RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rijk Zwaan Zaadteelt en Zaadhandel B.V. Burgemeester Crezeelaan 40 2678 KX De Lier / NL | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALISVAART, Jonathan Burgemeester Crezeelaan 40 2678 KX De Lier / NL | 02 /
FRIJTERS, Raoul Jacobus Johannes Maria Burgemeester Crezeelaan 40 2678 KX De Lier / NL | 03 /
LUDEKING, Daniël Johannes Wilhelmus Burgemeester Crezeelaan 40 2678 KX De Lier / NL | 04 /
ROOVERS, Alwin Johannes Marinus Burgemeester Crezeelaan 40 2678 KX De Lier / NL | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20820366.1 | 03.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020EP84504 | Priority number, date | WO2019EP83733 | 04.12.2019 Original published format: PCT/EP2019/083733 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021110855 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4069853 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C07K14/415, A01H5/00 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
C12N15/8283 (EP,IL,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,IL);
C12N9/1241 (US);
C12Q1/6895 (US);
C12Y207/07072 (US);
C12Q2600/13 (US);
C12Q2600/156 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | CCA-GEN FÜR VIRENRESISTENZ | [2022/41] | English: | CCA GENE FOR VIRUS RESISTANCE | [2022/41] | French: | GÈNE CCA POUR LA RÉSISTANCE AUX VIRUS | [2022/41] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 01.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY] - "Lycopersicon esculentum clone 132065F, mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (20040512), Database accession no. BT013425, URL: EBI, XP055714588 [X] 1,2,4 * sequence . * [Y] 1-13 | [Y] - N.N:, "putative CCA tRNA nucleotidyltransferase 2 (Solanum pennellii)", RefSeq, (20190128), Database accession no. XM_015201011.2, URL: EBI, XP055714321 [Y] 1-13 * sequence . * | [Y] - N.N, "Solanum lycopersicum putative CCA tRNA nucleotidyltransferase 2 (LOC101243854), mRNA", RefSeq, (20161122), Database accession no. XM_019211238.1, URL: EBI, XP055714322 [Y] 1-13 * sequence . * | [Y] - Cynthia L. Hemenway ET AL, "Manipulating Plant Viral RNA Transcription Signals", Genetic Engineering, Springer, Boston, MA, (20000101), pages 171 - 195, doi:https://doi.org/10.1007/978-1-4615-4199-8_10, ISBN 978-1-4613-6884-7, XP055714557 [Y] 14-16 * page 173, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 175, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/https://doi.org/10.1007/978-1-4615-4199-8_10 | [Y] - DREHER ET AL, "Role of tRNA-like structures in controlling plant virus replication", VIRUS RESEARCH, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 139, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.VIRUSRES.2008.06.010, ISSN 0168-1702, (20090201), pages 217 - 229, (20080730), XP025941297 [Y] 14-16 * page 225, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 226, column 1, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virusres.2008.06.010 | [Y] - RUI LI ET AL, "Multiplexed CRISPR/Cas9-mediated metabolic engineering of [gamma]-aminobutyric acid levels in Solanum lycopersicum", PLANT BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, GB, (20170802), vol. 16, no. 2, doi:10.1111/pbi.12781, ISSN 1467-7644, pages 415 - 427, XP055719424 [Y] 14-16 * page 424, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 425, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/pbi.12781 | by applicant | - LURIA et al., "A new Israeli tobamovirus isolate infects tomato plants harboring Tm-22 resistance genes", PLoS ONE, (20170000), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0170429, page e0170429, XP055469071 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0170429 | - MCCALLUM, Nature Biotechnology, (20000000), vol. 18, pages 455 - 457 |