EP4077979 - GEAR SHIFT DRUM ASSEMBLY FOR A SHIFT DEVICE OF A TRANSMISSION UNIT, AND TRANSMISSION UNIT FOR A DRIVE TRAIN OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna PT B.V. & Co. KG Hermann-Hagenmeyer-Strasse 1 74199 Untergruppenbach / DE | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRISTOFCSAK, Andras Schlebuscher Heide 7 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
KÖNIG, Axel Usambara Straße 1 50733 Köln / DE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Reuter, Silke Beatrix Magna International (Germany) GmbH Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11 63877 Sailauf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Völger, Silke Beatrix Magna International (Germany) GmbH Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11 63877 Sailauf / DE | Application number, filing date | 20820397.6 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP84763 | Priority number, date | DE201910220182 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019220182 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122072 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4077979 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/18, F16H63/34, F16H61/32 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
F16H63/18 (EP);
F16H63/3408 (EP);
F16H63/3433 (EP);
F16H61/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | SCHALTWALZENANORDNUNG FÜR EINE SCHALTVORRICHTUNG EINER GETRIEBEEINHEIT, SOWIE GETRIEBEEINHEIT FÜR EINEN ANTRIEBSSTRANG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2022/43] | English: | GEAR SHIFT DRUM ASSEMBLY FOR A SHIFT DEVICE OF A TRANSMISSION UNIT, AND TRANSMISSION UNIT FOR A DRIVE TRAIN OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2022/43] | French: | ENSEMBLE TAMBOUR DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE D'UNE UNITÉ DE TRANSMISSION ET UNITÉ DE TRANSMISSION POUR UNE CHAÎNE CINÉMATIQUE D'UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 14.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1855033 (GETRAG GETRIEBE ZAHNRAD [DE]) [Y] 1,2,13 * figures 1, 2 ** paragraphs [0001] , [ 0032] *; | [YA]EP3464959 (PUNCH POWERTRAIN NV [BE]) [Y] 1,2,13 * figures 1-9 * [A] 3-12 | by applicant | WO9702963 | DE102009018122 | DE19655083 | DE102012017817 | DE102014102831 | DE102014104575 |