EP4046072 - IMAGE ANALYSIS SYSTEM FOR TESTING IN MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bright Machines, Inc. 585 Howard St San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARGA, Melinda 585 Howard St San Francisco, California 94105 / US | 02 /
BOULIS, Konstantinos 585 Howard St San Francisco, California 94105 / US | 03 /
AKMAN, Oytun 585 Howard St San Francisco, California 94105 / US | 04 /
SOLDEVILLA ESTRADA, Julio 585 Howard St San Francisco, California 94105 / US | 05 /
MATHEWS, Brian Philip 585 Howard St San Francisco, California 94105 / US | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20820745.6 | 12.11.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020US70777 | Priority number, date | US201962934397P | 12.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962934397 P | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021097486 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4046072 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/62, G06K9/68, G06N3/04, G06T7/00 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
G06T7/0004 (EP,US);
G06F18/254 (EP);
G06F18/285 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP);
G06T1/20 (US);
G06T7/001 (US);
G06V10/809 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V30/19113 (EP,US);
G06V30/248 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10116 (US);
G06T2207/20081 (EP);
G06T2207/20084 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20092 (EP);
G06T2207/30141 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | BILDANALYSESYSTEM ZUR PRÜFUNG IN DER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/34] | English: | IMAGE ANALYSIS SYSTEM FOR TESTING IN MANUFACTURING | [2022/34] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANALYSE D'IMAGE POUR TEST DE FABRICATION | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 20.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2017082555 (HE LI [US], et al) |