EP4069519 - METHOD AND MACHINE FOR PRINTING ON A WORKPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOMAG GmbH Homagstrasse 3-5 72296 Schopfloch / DE | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMID, Johannes Weinbergstr. 24 72181 Starzach / DE | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20820842.1 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020EP84703 | Priority number, date | DE201910133336 | 06.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019133336 | [2022/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021110951 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4069519 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/28, B41J3/407, B41J3/54 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
B41J3/286 (EP,US);
B41J3/4073 (EP,US);
B41J3/543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN SOWIE MASCHINE ZUM BEDRUCKEN EINES WERKSTÜCKS | [2022/41] | English: | METHOD AND MACHINE FOR PRINTING ON A WORKPIECE | [2022/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET MACHINE D'IMPRESSION SUR UNE PIÈCE | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 30.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]DE10031030 (BAUER JOERG R [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-12,15 * paragraphs [0041] - [0042] * [A] 8,14 [I] 7,13; | [XDA]EP1837189 (HOMAG HOLZBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [XD] 1-5,9-11,15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0 28] , [0 30] , [0034] , [0 40]; figures 3, 5; claims 1, 3 * [A] 6-8,12-14; | [X]EP1892108 (HOMAG HOLZBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1,10* paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019]; figure 3 * | by applicant | EP1837189 |