EP4077452 - POLYURETHANE FOAMS BASED ON POLYETHER CARBONATE POLYOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARAFILIDIS, Christos Lurchenweg 41 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
LEVEN, Matthias Im Thurner Feld 60 51069 Köln / DE | 03 /
HILKEN, Persefoni Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee Gebäude B103 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
FAERBER, Veronica-Alina Rothbroicher Str. 6 51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 05 /
MICHALIK, Darius Von-Brentano-Straße 5 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 06 /
WEHLAU, Antje Schleiermacherstr. 19 51377 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude K12 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20821232.4 | 14.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP85932 | Priority number, date | EP20190217604 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19217604 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122431 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4077452 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/44, C08G18/16, C08G18/18, C08G18/24, C08G18/40, C08G18/48, C08G18/76, C08J9/00, C08J9/12, C08G101/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
C08G18/44 (EP);
C08G18/165 (EP);
C08G18/1833 (EP);
C08G18/246 (EP);
C08G18/4018 (EP);
C08G18/485 (EP);
C08G18/7621 (EP);
C08G2110/0008 (EP);
C08G2110/005 (EP);
C08G2110/0083 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | POLYURETHANSCHAUMSTOFFE BASIEREND AUF POLYETHERCARBONATPOLYOLEN | [2022/43] | English: | POLYURETHANE FOAMS BASED ON POLYETHER CARBONATE POLYOLS | [2022/43] | French: | MOUSSES DE POLYURÉTHANE À BASE DE POLYÉTHER-CARBONATE-POLYOLS | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 18.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/29] | 28.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP3377553 (COVESTRO DEUTSCHLAND AG [DE]) [I] 1-15 * claims 1-12 * * page 1, line 3 - line 9 * * page 1, line 22 - line 30 ** examples 1-4; table 1 *; | [I]EP3549969 (COVESTRO DEUTSCHLAND AG [DE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 5] , [00 6]; claims 1-15 * * examples 3-5, 7-9; table 1 * | by applicant | US3404109 | US3829505 | US3941849 | US4089835 | EP0000389 | EP0007502 | US4260530 | GB2072204 | DE3103757 | US4374209 | EP0176013 | EP0222453 | EP0355000 | US5158922 | US5470813 | EP0700949 | EP0743093 | EP0761708 | WO9740086 | WO9816310 | WO0047649 | EP1359177 | WO2008013731 | EP2115032 | WO2012130760 | WO2016097729 | - B. INOUE et al., "Copolymerization of Carbon Dioxide and Epoxide with Organometallic Compounds", Die Makromolekulare Chemie, (19690000), vol. 130, doi:10.1002/macp.1969.021300112, pages 210 - 220, XP001018750 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/macp.1969.021300112 |