EP3950435 - ONBOARD NETWORK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE, PL, PT, RO | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2023/26] |
Former [2022/06] | For all designated states MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUROKAWA, Yoshimasa c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION, 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu- cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
YAMASHITA, Tetsuhiro c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION, 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu- cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2023/26] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
KUROKAWA, Yoshimasa Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMASHITA, Tetsuhiro Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20822498.0 | 17.03.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020JP11617 | Priority number, date | JP20190110620 | 13.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019110620 | [2022/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020250530 | Date: | 17.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3950435 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3950435 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02, H02J7/00, H02J1/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
H02J1/08 (EP);
B60R16/0238 (US);
B60R16/023 (EP,US);
H02J1/14 (EP);
H02J7/00 (US);
H02J2310/46 (EP);
H02J2310/62 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BORDNETZWERKSYSTEM | [2022/06] | English: | ONBOARD NETWORK SYSTEM | [2022/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU EMBARQUÉ | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2021 | Translation filed | 27.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 25.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2023 | CZ | 28.06.2023 | EE | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | FI | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | LT | 28.06.2023 | LV | 28.06.2023 | NL | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SE | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | PT | 30.10.2023 | [2024/10] |
Former [2024/09] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001037092 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0044] , [0045] , [0049] *; | [AD]JP2016201740 (DENSO CORP) [AD] 1-3* abstract *; | [Y]US2017317515 (SATAKE SHUUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0 35] , [0 37] , [0 38] * | International search | [Y]JP2001037092 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0044]-[0051], fig. 1, 4-5 *; | [A]JP2008155892 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al) [A] 1-3 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2009220806 (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1-3 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2013230030 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO, et al) [A] 1-3* entire text, all drawings *; | [Y]JP2016159651 (AUTO NETWORK GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO KK , et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0033]-[0042], fig. 2-3 *; | [Y]JP2017200347 (YAZAKI CORP) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0016]-[0025], [0051]-[0052], fig. 1-6, 12 *; | [A]JP2018129965 (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1-3 * entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP2016201740 |